Ghawi v. Law firm Howard L. Schiff, P.C. et al

Plaintiff: Nabil Ghawi
Defendant: Law firm Howard L. Schiff, P.C., Jeanine M. Dumont, Heath A. Tiberio, Rebecca Jadach and Quaneshia Dailey-Thompson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00115
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2016 214 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SUA SPONTE DISMISSAL OF CUTPA CLAIM: In light of the Court's dismissal of Mr. Ghawi's CUTPA claim to the extent it rested on losses other than monetary losses in the form of phone charges, and the Court's finding that Mr. Gha wi has introduced no evidence that he in fact received phone charges, the Court hereby notifies the parties of its intent to sua sponte dismiss the CUTPA claim (Count V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint). The parties' responses, if any, shall be filed no later than February 5, 2016 at 5 p.m. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/3/16. (Harris, J)
January 21, 2016 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion 196 to Amend is DENIED and Plaintiff's Motion 190 In Limine to Bar Reference to the Statute of Limitations is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/21/16. (Harris, J)
January 6, 2016 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting in part and denying in part 191 Motion in Limine and setting out the Court's orders on the motions in limine and objections contained in the Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/6/16. (Harris, J)
November 10, 2015 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Mr. Ghawi's Motion 89 for Summary Judgment is DENIED; Citibank's Motion 154 for Summary Judgment is GRANTED with respect to Mr. Ghawi's claims about calls made by Citibank itself and DENIED with respect to Mr. Ghawi's c laims based on calls made by the HLS Defendants; and the HLS Defendants' Motion 102 for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's FDCPA §§ 1692d(6) and e(1) claims and otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/10/15. (Harris, J)
October 21, 2015 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The HLS Defendants' Motion 152 to Strike is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/21/15. (Harris, J)
August 11, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Citibank's Motion 106 to Amend/Correct is GRANTED; Citibank's Motion 129 to Strike is GRANTED; Citibank's Motion 130 to Strike is GRANTED as to the substance of the Objection and DENIED as to the attached telephone records. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/11/15. (Harris, J)
May 18, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING (see attached) denying in large part 78 Defendant Citibank's Motion for Protective Order; granting in part 80 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Compliance by the HLS Defendants; and granting in part 90 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/18/2015. (Watson, M.)
December 1, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion 60 to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The following claims are dismissed in their entirety: (1) 47 U.S.C. § 227(e); (2) TILA, 15 U.S.C. § 1643(b); (3) Mail Fraud, 18 U.S.C. § 1341; (4) &q uot;Unconscionability"; (5) "Misconduct"; (6) C.G.S. § 16-256e; (7) RICO, 18 U.S.C. § 1961 et seq.; (8) FDCPA, 15 U.S.C. §§ 1692b(1) & (3), 1692e(2), and 1692f(1); (9) Connecticut TILA, C.G.S. § 36a-681; and ( 10) C.G.S. § 42-288a. In addition, all claims under the FDCPA and CUTPA are dismissed as to Defendant Citibank. The remaining claims-(1) FDCPA, 15 U.S.C. §§ 1692c(a)(1), 1692d(5) & (6), 1692e(10), and 1692g(b) as to HLS and HLS employees; (2) TCPA, 47 U.S.C. § 227(b) as to all Defendants; and (3) CUTPA, C.G.S. § 42-110 et seq. as to HLS and HLS employees-are not dismissed. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/1/14. (Harris, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghawi v. Law firm Howard L. Schiff, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabil Ghawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law firm Howard L. Schiff, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanine M. Dumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath A. Tiberio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Jadach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quaneshia Dailey-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?