USA v. $822,694.81 in United States Currency Seized From Account No. XXXXXXXX7424 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $822,694.81 in United States Currency Seized From Account No. XXXXXXXX7424
Claimant: Godwin Ezeemo and Winifred C.N. Ezeemo
Intervenor: Weycer, Kaplan, Pulaski & Zuber
Case Number: 3:2013cv00545
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER: The motions for summary judgment 115 136 144 150 are denied. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 9/30/19. (Constantine, A.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 119 the motion for summary judgment filed by the Ezeemos. See attached. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 9/12/2019. (Constantine, A.)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: See attached order re 112 , 113 , 114 , 117 , 118 , 120 , 123 , 124 , 125 , 126 , and 127 .Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 12/12/2018. (Greenspoon, L.)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re: 89 January 30, 2017 Settlement Conference at 1:00 PM Eastern Standard Time. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED CONFERENCE ORDER. Parties who seek leave to particpate in the conference by phone will to call the Court at the start of the conference at 203 579-5640. The parties may email their ex parte letter to the law clerk by January 26, 2017 at: alyssa_esposito@ctd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 1/12/17.(Esposito, A.)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Reconsideration. On reconsideration, the Court adheres to its previous ruling. Please see attached Ruling and Order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/31/16. (Samuels, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $822,694.81 in United States Currency Seized From Account No. XXXXXXXX7424 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $822,694.81 in United States Currency Seized From Account No. XXXXXXXX7424
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Godwin Ezeemo
Represented By: Okechukwu Valentine Nnebe
Represented By: Gregory Osakwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Winifred C.N. Ezeemo
Represented By: Okechukwu Valentine Nnebe
Represented By: Gregory Osakwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Weycer, Kaplan, Pulaski & Zuber
Represented By: Andrew B. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?