Carney v. Horion Investments Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: John J. Carney
Defendant: Jespa Mawad De Mouawad, Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad, Romeo Mouawad Mouawad, Tania Mouawad Mawad, Horion Investments Ltd., Grimsel Group Ltd., Piero Enrique Montelli Torres, IVP Overseas Ltd., Inverplus Sociedad De Corretaje De Titulos Valores, C.A. and M. Holding S.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00660
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Stipulation of Dismissal of Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad and M. Holding S.A., and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Romeo Mikael Mouawad Mouawad, Jespa Mawad de Mouawad, Tania Mouawad Mawad, Horion Investment Ltd., and Grimsel Group Ltd., filed by John J. Carney Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2015. (Oliver, T.)
December 1, 2015 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Oliver, T.)
November 30, 2015 Filing 83 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad and M. Holding S.A., and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Romeo Mikael Mouawad Mouawad, Jespa Mawad de Mouawad, Tania Mouawad Mawad, Horion Investment Ltd., and Grimsel Group Ltd. by John J. Carney. (Wang, Ona)
July 10, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D. Goldberg on behalf of Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad and M. Holding, S. A. (Goldberg, Thomas)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER approving #78 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 7/1/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2016. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/10/2015.(Pollack, R.)
July 10, 2015 Filing 80 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad.(Schwartz, Adam)
July 10, 2015 Filing 79 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by M. Holding S.A..(Schwartz, Adam)
July 8, 2015 Filing 78 Amended REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Ona)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Extension of Time until July 10, 2015, to answer Amended Complaint; denying as moot #76 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/29/2015. (Pollack, R.)
May 29, 2015 Answer deadline updated for M. Holding, Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad to 7/10/2015. (Pollack, R.)
May 27, 2015 Filing 76 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #75 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss by M. Holding S.A., Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Schwartz, Adam)
May 26, 2015 Filing 75 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss by M. Holding S.A., Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Schwartz, Adam)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying #52 Motion to Dismiss with respect to all claims except common law fraudulent transfer and conversion (Counts Four and Six), which the Receiver withdraws. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/12/2015. (Pollack, R.)
December 8, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad re #53 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #52 First MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (Schwartz, Adam)
December 5, 2014 Filing 72 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Report to the Court on the Status of Service of Process on Remaining Defendants by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Ona)
November 21, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE TO COUNSEL ( Status Report due by 12/5/2014) Signed by Clerk on 11/21/2014.(Jaiman, R.)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason A. Buchsbaum and Stewart I. Edelstein terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/13/14. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 5, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Piero Enrique Montelli Torres, Inverplus Sociedad De Corretaje De Titulos Valores, C.A. and IVP Overseas Ltd. with Prejudice by John J. Carney (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Ona)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying as moot #35 Motion to Bifurcate; granting in part and denying in part #35 Motion to Stay; granting nunc pro tunc #37 Motion for Extension of Time. Jurisdictional discovery shall commence 3/24/2014; Fact discovery shall commence 30 days after the Court's ruling on defendants' #52 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/20/2014. (Martin, M.)
March 12, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION for Jason A. Buchsbaum and Stewart I Edelstein to Withdraw as Attorney by M. Holding S.A., Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Buchsbaum, Jason) Modified on 3/13/2014 added attorney listed in pdf document that was missing from the docket text (Ghilardi, K.).
March 11, 2014 Filing 66 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Ona)
March 6, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Wenner on behalf of M. Holding S.A., Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad (Wenner, Daniel)
January 15, 2014 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to #52 First MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by M. Holding S.A., Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2014: #2 REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHABLE PDF, #3 Exhibit A - REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHABLE PDF) (Oliver, T.).
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/19/2013. (Martin, M.)
December 19, 2013 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 15, 2014 to File Reply Brief #59 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by M. Holding S.A., Jespa Mawad De Mouawad. (Schwartz, Adam)
December 17, 2013 Docket Entry Correction re #61 Summons Returned Executed MODIFIED TO EDIT TEXT TO INCLUDE PARTY SERVIED AND DATE EXECUTION DATE (Oliver, T.)
December 16, 2013 Answer deadline updated for Piero Enrique Montelli Torres to 12/10/2013. (Oliver, T.)
December 16, 2013 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Piero Enrique Montelli Torres served on 11/19/2013, answer due 12/10/2013 by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Service, #2 Exhibit A-Service Documentation, #3 Exhibit B-English Translation of Certain Portions of Exhibit A)(Wang, Ona) Modified on 12/17/2013 (Oliver, T.).
November 22, 2013 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John J. Carney re #59 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Wang, Ona)
November 22, 2013 Filing 59 Memorandum in Opposition re #52 First MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rafael Gonzalez, #2 Declaration of Andrew Rosini, #3 Declaration of Hernando Diaz-Candia)(Wang, Ona)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion to amend briefing schedule. The requested schedule is adopted. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/24/13. (Sbalbi, B.)
October 15, 2013 Filing 57 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to the Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Modification of Page Limitations #52 First MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Ona)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/9/13. (Sbalbi, B.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to #35 First MOTION to Bifurcate Rule 12(b) Motions and to Stay Discovery filed by M. Holding S.A., Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Schwartz, Adam)
October 2, 2013 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #46 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin Jacobs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3014222), #44 MOTION for Attorney(s) Luis E. Delgado to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3014079), #45 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam L. Schwartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3014119) by M. Holding S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Jacobs Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Delgado Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Schwartz Certificate of Good Sanding)(Edelstein, Stewart)
September 30, 2013 Filing 53 Memorandum in Support re #52 First MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by M. Holding S.A., Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decl. of Miguel Mouawad Mawad, #2 Exhibit B - Decl. of Adam L. Schwartz, #3 Exhibit C - Decl. of Andrew Thorp, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Julie-Ann Ellis-Bradley, #5 Exhibit E - Decl. of Luis Alberto Garcia Montoya)(Schwartz, Adam)
September 30, 2013 Filing 52 First MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by M. Holding S.A., Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad.Responses due by 10/21/2013 (Schwartz, Adam)
September 30, 2013 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (40) Pages of Memorandum of Law by M. Holding S.A., Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Schwartz, Adam)
September 30, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam L. Schwartz on behalf of M. Holding S.A. Luis E. Delgado, Kevin Jacobs & Adam L. Schwartz (Schwartz, Adam)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Attorney Kevin Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kevin P. Jacobs for M. Holding S.A. added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/26/2013. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2013. (Oliver, T.)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Attorney Adam L. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adam L. Schwartz for M. Holding S.A. added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/26/2013. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2013. (Oliver, T.)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Attorney Luis E. Delgado to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Luis E. Delgado for M. Holding S.A. added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/26/2013. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2013. (Oliver, T.)
September 25, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin Jacobs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3014222) by M. Holding S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Kevin Jacobs)(Edelstein, Stewart)
September 25, 2013 Filing 45 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam L. Schwartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3014119) by M. Holding S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Adam L. Schwartz)(Edelstein, Stewart)
September 25, 2013 Filing 44 MOTION for Attorney(s) Luis E. Delgado to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3014079) by M. Holding S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Luis E. Delgado)(Edelstein, Stewart)
September 20, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Buchsbaum on behalf of M. Holding S.A. (Buchsbaum, Jason)
September 20, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Stewart I. Edelstein on behalf of M. Holding S.A. (Edelstein, Stewart)
September 19, 2013 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT re #35 First MOTION to Bifurcate Rule 12(b) Motions and to Stay Discovery Signed By Ona T. Wang in Support of Receiver's Opposition to Motion for Bifurcation of Briefing and to Stay Discovery filed by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Ona T. Wang in Support of Receiver's Opposition to Motion for Bifurcation of Briefing and to Stay Discovery, #2 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Ona T. Wang in Support of Receiver's Opposition to Motion for Bifurcation of Briefing and to Stay Discovery, #3 Certificate of Service of the Declaration of Ona T. Wang in Support of Receiver's Opposition to Motion for Bifurcation of Briefing and to Stay Discovery)(Wang, Ona)
September 19, 2013 Filing 40 Memorandum in Opposition re #35 First MOTION to Bifurcate Rule 12(b) Motions and to Stay Discovery filed by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Receiver's Opposition to Motion for Bifurcation of Briefing and to Stay Discovery)(Wang, Ona)
September 19, 2013 Filing 39 Memorandum in Opposition re #35 First MOTION to Bifurcate Rule 12(b) Motions and to Stay Discovery filed by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Receiver's Opposition to Motion for Bifurcation of Briefing and to Stay Discovery, #2 Certificate of Service of Receiver's Opposition to Motion for Bifurcation of Briefing and to Stay Discovery)(Wang, Ona)
September 17, 2013 Filing 38 First RESPONSE re #37 MOTION for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc, to Confer Under Rule 26 and File Rule 26 Report filed by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Adam)
September 16, 2013 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc, to Confer Under Rule 26 and File Rule 26 Report by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Ona)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/30/13 to respond to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/4/13. (Sbalbi, B.)
August 29, 2013 Filing 35 First MOTION to Bifurcate Rule 12(b) Motions and to Stay Discovery by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad.Responses due by 9/19/2013 (Schwartz, Adam)
August 29, 2013 Filing 34 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 33 Order on Motion for Extension of Time Amended Second Motion on Consent for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad.Responses due by 9/19/2013 (Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 8/30/2013 to correct motion relief(Garguilo, B).
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/30/13 to respond to #9 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/27/13. (Sbalbi, B.)
August 22, 2013 Filing 32 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2013 on Consent to File Responsive Pleading #9 Amended Complaint by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Edelstein, Stewart)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/19/13.(Torrenti, R.)
August 19, 2013 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad re #28 Certificate of Good Standing, #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam L. Schwartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2967621) (Edelstein, Stewart)
August 19, 2013 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad re #27 Certificate of Good Standing, #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Attorney Luis E. Delgado to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2967604) (Edelstein, Stewart)
August 16, 2013 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam L. Schwartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2967621) by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Edelstein, Stewart)
August 16, 2013 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Attorney Luis E. Delgado to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2967604) by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Edelstein, Stewart)
August 14, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Jacobs on behalf of Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad (Jacobs, Kevin)
August 14, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam L. Schwartz on behalf of Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad (Schwartz, Adam)
August 14, 2013 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin P. Jacobs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2970339) by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Edelstein, Stewart)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin P. Jacobs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/13/2013. Signed by Clerk on 8/14/13. (Torrenti, R.)
August 13, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin P. Jacobs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2970339) by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Edelstein, Stewart)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion For Attorney Luis E. Delgado to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #20 Motion For Attorney Adam L. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificates of Good Standing due by 10/12/2013. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2013. (Malone, P.)
August 9, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam L. Schwartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2967621) by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Edelstein, Stewart)
August 9, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Attorney Luis E. Delgado to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2967604) by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Edelstein, Stewart)
August 7, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stewart I. Edelstein on behalf of Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad (Edelstein, Stewart)
August 6, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/16/2013 (DeRubeis, B.)
August 5, 2013 Answer deadline updated for Horion Investments Ltd. to 9/8/2013; M. Holding S.A. to 9/8/2013. (Torrenti, R.)
August 2, 2013 Answer deadline updated for Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad to 9/8/2013. (Gutierrez, Y.)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/08/2013On Consent to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad.. Signed by Clerk on 8/1/13. (Torrenti, R.)
August 1, 2013 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/08/2013On Consent to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buchsbaum, Jason)
August 1, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Buchsbaum on behalf of Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad (Buchsbaum, Jason)
July 25, 2013 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. M. Holding S.A. served on 7/13/2013, answer due 8/3/2013. (Wang, Ona)
July 25, 2013 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad served on 7/13/2013, answer due 8/3/2013. (Wang, Ona)
July 25, 2013 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J. Carney. Horion Investments Ltd. served on 7/13/2013, answer due 8/3/2013. (Wang, Ona)
July 8, 2013 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Grimsel Group Ltd., IVP Overseas Ltd., Inverplus Sociedad De Corretaje De Titulos Valores, C.A., M. Holding S.A., Piero Enrique Montelli Torres* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ona Theresa Wang* *Baker & Hostetler LLP - NY* *45 Rockefeller Plaza* *New York, NY 10111*. (Torrenti, R.)
July 8, 2013 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Horion Investments Ltd., Jespa Mawad De Mouawad, Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad, Tania Mouawad Mawad, Romeo Mouawad Mouawad* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ona Theresa Wang* *Baker & Hostetler LLP - NY* *45 Rockefeller Plaza* *New York, NY 10111*. (Torrenti, R.)
July 3, 2013 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint)(Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to IVP Overseas Ltd.. (Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Horion Investments Ltd.. (Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Grimsel Group Ltd.. (Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to M. Holding S.A.. (Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Inverplus Sociedad De Corretaje De Titulos Valores, C.A.. (Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Tania Mouawad Mawad. (Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Romeo Mouawad Mouawad. (Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad. (Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Piero Enrique Montelli Torres. (Wang, Ona)
July 3, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Jespa Mawad De Mouawad. (Wang, Ona)
May 9, 2013 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Horion Investments Ltd., Jespa Mawad De Mouawad, Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad, Tania Mouawad Mawad, Romeo Mouawad Mouawad* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ona Theresa Wang* *Baker & Hostetler LLP - NY* *45 Rockefeller Plaza* *New York, NY 10111*. (Torrenti, R.)
May 9, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by John J. Carney, #2 Notice (Other) filed by John J. Carney, #3 Exhibit filed by John J. Carney Signed by Clerk on 5/9/13.(Torrenti, R.)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/8/13.(Torrenti, R.)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/8/13.(Torrenti, R.)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/8/13. Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2013 Discovery due by 11/7/2013 Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2013 Signed by Clerk on 5/8/13.(Torrenti, R.)
May 8, 2013 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Malone, P.)
May 8, 2013 Filing 3 EXHIBIT A to Complaint by John J. Carney, Esq. re #1 Complaint,. (Wang, Ona)
May 8, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE by John J. Carney, Esq. of Related Cases (Wang, Ona)
May 8, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Horion Investments Ltd., Jespa Mawad De Mouawad, Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad, Tania Mouawad Mawad, Romeo Mouawad Mouawad ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-2872340.), filed by John J. Carney, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wang, Ona)
May 8, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Wang, Ona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carney v. Horion Investments Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Carney
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jespa Mawad De Mouawad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Antonio Mouawad Mawad
Represented By: Daniel E. Wenner
Represented By: Thomas D. Goldberg
Represented By: Adam L. Schwartz
Represented By: Kevin P. Jacobs
Represented By: Luis E. Delgado
Represented By: Jason A. Buchsbaum
Represented By: Stewart I. Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Mouawad Mouawad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tania Mouawad Mawad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horion Investments Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grimsel Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piero Enrique Montelli Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVP Overseas Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inverplus Sociedad De Corretaje De Titulos Valores, C.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Holding S.A.
Represented By: Daniel E. Wenner
Represented By: Adam L. Schwartz
Represented By: Kevin P. Jacobs
Represented By: Thomas D. Goldberg
Represented By: Luis E. Delgado
Represented By: Jason A. Buchsbaum
Represented By: Stewart I. Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?