Sorensen et al v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sorensen and Peter Sorensen
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00749
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2015 425 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion 399 in Limine is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/1/15. (Harris, J)
November 20, 2015 419 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 395 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 398 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/20/15. (Harris, J)
September 28, 2015 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion 313 to Dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice as to Xilin Jordan. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/28/15. (Harris, J)
June 17, 2015 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion 160 for Leave to File Amended Answer is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/17/15. (Harris, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorensen et al v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sorensen
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Sorensen
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Represented By: Charles A. Deluca
Represented By: Beck S. Fineman
Represented By: Robert O. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?