Edwards et al v. Hartford et al
Plaintiff: Fabian Edwards, Kenville Edwards, KeithMichael Mitto and Elizabeth Edwards
Defendant: City of Hartford, James Rovella, Matthew Cornell, Christopher May and Eric Baumgarten
Case Number: 3:2013cv00878
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Warren W. Eginton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting 166 Motion for Attorneys' Fees; granting 222 Motion for Attorneys' Fees for the reasons set forth in the attached. Attorneys' fees are awarded in the amount of $141,505.00 and costs are awarded in the amount of $7,024.70, for a total award of $148,529.70. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/11/18. (Cates, S)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER denying 174 Motion for Judgment; denying 175 Motion for New Trial for the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling. The verdict in favor of Kenville Edwards is sustained. The amount of punitive damages is reduced as stated in the attached. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 11/28/17. (Cates, S)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 170 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law for the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 9/13/17. (Cates, S)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying 118 , 129 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law for the reasons set forth in the attached. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/7/17. (Cates, S)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/23/15. (Gould, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. Hartford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Edwards
Represented By: Peter M. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenville Edwards
Represented By: Peter M. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeithMichael Mitto
Represented By: Peter M. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Edwards
Represented By: Peter M. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hartford
Represented By: Nathalie Feola-Guerrieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rovella
Represented By: Nathalie Feola-Guerrieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cornell
Represented By: Alan Raymond Dembiczak
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher May
Represented By: Alan Raymond Dembiczak
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Baumgarten
Represented By: Alan Raymond Dembiczak
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?