Brown v. UConn Managed Health Care et al

Plaintiff: Kenya Brown
Defendant: UConn Managed Health Care, Saed Naqvi and Omprakash Pillai
Case Number: 3:2013cv00931
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 96 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the defendants and close this case. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/26/16. (Tooker, A.)
July 24, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion 68 for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/24/15. (Harris, J)
October 28, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON PENDING MOTIONS: granting [Dkt. #34] Motion to Amend/Correct; denying without prejudice to renew ar a later time [Dkt. #35] Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice to renew at a later time [Dkt. #30] Motion for Order (Motion for Depositions on Written Questions); granting absent objection [Dkt. #31] Motion for Leave to File Documents Electronically. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 10/28/2014. (Watson, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. UConn Managed Health Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UConn Managed Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saed Naqvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omprakash Pillai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?