Graham et al v. BMO Harris Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Graham and Ellen Russo
Defendant: National Bank of California, N.A., Missouri Bank and Trust, BMO Harris Bank N.A., North American Banking Company, First International Bank & Trust and First Premier Bank
Case Number: 3:2013cv01460
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2014 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ghilardi, K.)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/20/2014.(Ghilardi, K.)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #204 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alison P. Baker terminated. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/08/14. (Welles, T.)
August 7, 2014 Filing 204 MOTION for Alison P. Baker to Withdraw as Attorney by First Premier Bank. (Baker, Alison)
August 5, 2014 Filing 203 RESPONSE re #200 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION of Michael Mathews in Support of National Bank of California's Memorandum in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause Why the Claims Against it Should not Proceed to Arbitration)(Grinalds, Maura)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #201 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rita Lin terminated. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/5/2014. (Ghilardi, K.)
July 31, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION for Rita F. Lin to Withdraw as Attorney by First Premier Bank. (Lin, Rita)
July 16, 2014 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION denying without prejudice #31 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice #64 Motion to Dismiss; granting #64 Motion to Compel; granting #111 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice #114 Motion to Dismiss; granting #111 Motion to Stay; granting #121 Motion to Compel; granting #121 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice #121 Motion to Dismiss; granting #128 Motion to Compel; granting #150 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice #152 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice #176 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice #181 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/16/2014. (Ghilardi, K.)
July 11, 2014 Filing 199 Joint Notice of Additional Authority in Support of Motions to Compel Arbitration re #128 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #121 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss , #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. MOTION to Stay, #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel, #150 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Christopher Graham's Claims filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., First International Bank & Trust, First Premier Bank, Missouri Bank and Trust, North American Banking Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cowdery, James)
June 23, 2014 Filing 198 RESPONSE re #195 Notice of Additional Authority,,, filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting #196 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter J. Schwingler terminated. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/23/2014. (Ghilardi, K.)
June 16, 2014 Filing 196 MOTION for Peter J. Schwingler to Withdraw as Attorney by North American Banking Company. (Schwingler, Peter)
June 12, 2014 Filing 195 Notice of Additional Authority (Defendants' Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motions to Compel Arbitration) re #128 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #121 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss , #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. MOTION to Stay, #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel, #150 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Christopher Graham's Claims filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., First International Bank & Trust, First Premier Bank, Missouri Bank and Trust, North American Banking Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6-9-2014 Order Compelling Arbitration in Moss v. BMO Harris Bank, N.A., 13cv5438 (E.D.N.Y.))(Mancini, A.)
May 21, 2014 Filing 194 RESPONSE by Missouri Bank and Trust to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Gillard, Ashley)
May 21, 2014 Filing 193 REPLY to Response to #181 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Graham's Complaint, Filed in the Alternative to its Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by North American Banking Company. (Doroghazi, John)
May 19, 2014 Filing 192 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #177 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Carey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3184888) by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Gillard, Ashley)
May 13, 2014 Filing 191 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION re #107 Motion to Dismiss; denying #107 Motion to Sever denying #109 Motion to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/9/2014. (Ghilardi, K.)
May 9, 2014 Filing 190 RESPONSE re #187 Notice (Other) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
May 8, 2014 Filing 189 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant North American Banking Company re #181 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Graham's Complaint, Filed in the Alternative to its Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying #137 MOTION to Strike #66 Affidavit of Natalie C. Dempsey and Attached Exhibits. As the affidavit is based on personal knowledge and exhibits are adequately authenticated. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/6/2014. (Ghilardi, K.)
May 5, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grenon, Karen)
April 29, 2014 Filing 186 Second NOTICE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., First International Bank & Trust, First Premier Bank, Missouri Bank and Trust, North American Banking Company re #128 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #182 Notice (Other),, #121 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss , #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. MOTION to Stay, #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel, #150 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Christopher Graham's Claims, #185 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motions to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cowdery, James)
April 24, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE by Missouri Bank and Trust of Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration (Gillard, Ashley)
April 24, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo re #157 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #162 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #136 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #145 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grenon, Karen)
April 24, 2014 Filing 183 RESPONSE re #182 Notice (Other),, to Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
April 23, 2014 Filing 182 Joint NOTICE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., First International Bank & Trust, First Premier Bank, North American Banking Company re #128 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #121 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss , #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel, #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. MOTION to Stay of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motions to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cowdery, James)
April 17, 2014 Filing 181 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Graham's Complaint, Filed in the Alternative to its Motion to Compel Arbitration by North American Banking Company.Responses due by 5/8/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Todd A. Notebroom, #3 Exhibit 1)(Doroghazi, John)
April 10, 2014 Filing 180 REPLY to Response to #176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Russo's Complaint, Filed in the Alternative to Its Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Cowdery, James)
March 27, 2014 Filing 179 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant First International Bank and Trust re #176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Russo's Complaint, Filed in the Alternative to Its Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Grenon, Karen)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #177 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael P. Carey Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/23/2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/24/2014. (Ghilardi, K.)
March 19, 2014 Filing 177 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Carey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3184888) by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Letter regarding current status, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cesare, Christine)
March 6, 2014 Filing 176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Russo's Complaint, Filed in the Alternative to Its Motion to Compel Arbitration by First International Bank & Trust.Responses due by 3/27/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Rita F. Lin)(Cowdery, James)
February 28, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE by National Bank of California, N.A. of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grinalds, Maura)
February 18, 2014 Filing 174 Memorandum in Support re #152 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to add an indispensable party and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted /Reply Memorandum of Law of Defendant Missouri Bank's in Further Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Thompson, Robert)
February 18, 2014 Filing 173 Memorandum in Support re #150 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Christopher Graham's Claims /Reply Memorandum of Law of Defendant Missouri Bank's in Further Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Christopher Graham's Claims filed by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Thompson, Robert)
February 17, 2014 Filing 172 REPLY to Response to #121 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss filed by First Premier Bank. (Baker, Alison)
February 5, 2014 Filing 171 Memorandum in Support re #114 MOTION to Dismiss , Rule 12(b)(6)-(7) and 19 Motion to Dismiss filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Mancini, A.)
February 5, 2014 Filing 170 Memorandum in Support re #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. MOTION to Stay filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Mancini, A.)
February 5, 2014 Filing 169 Memorandum in Support re #109 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mancini, A.)
February 5, 2014 Filing 168 Memorandum in Support re #107 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 21. MOTION to Sever filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Mancini, A.)
February 3, 2014 Filing 167 Memorandum in Opposition re #152 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to add an indispensable party and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted filed by Christopher Graham. (Grenon, Karen)
February 3, 2014 Filing 166 Memorandum in Opposition re #150 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Christopher Graham's Claims filed by Christopher Graham. (Grenon, Karen)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #163 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Declaration of Lucia Nale in Support of Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Mancini, A.). Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/31/2014. (Ghilardi, K.)
January 29, 2014 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to #128 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by North American Banking Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Second Declaration of Peter J. Schwingler), #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Peter J. Schwingler)(Schwingler, Peter)
January 29, 2014 Filing 163 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of Lucia Nale in Support of Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Mancini, A.)
January 27, 2014 Filing 162 Memorandum in Opposition re #121 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
January 23, 2014 Filing 161 RESPONSE re #137 MOTION to Strike #66 Affidavit of Natalie C. Dempsey and Attached Exhibits filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
January 17, 2014 Filing 160 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter J. Schwingler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3073151) by North American Banking Company. (Schwingler, Peter)
January 17, 2014 Filing 159 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #54 MOTION for Attorney(s) Todd A. Noteboom to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3073132) by North American Banking Company. (Schwingler, Peter)
January 17, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE by North American Banking Company (Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation) (Schwingler, Peter)
January 15, 2014 Filing 157 Memorandum in Opposition re #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. MOTION to Stay filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 156 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant BMO Harris Bank, N.A.'s re #114 MOTION to Dismiss , Rule 12(b)(6)-(7) and 19 Motion to Dismiss filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 155 Memorandum in Opposition re #107 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 21. MOTION to Sever filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
January 15, 2014 Filing 154 Memorandum in Opposition re #109 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
January 13, 2014 Filing 153 Memorandum in Support re #152 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to add an indispensable party and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted filed by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Thompson, Robert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 152 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to add an indispensable party and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by Missouri Bank and Trust.Responses due by 2/3/2014 (Thompson, Robert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 151 Memorandum in Support re #150 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Christopher Graham's Claims filed by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thompson, Robert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Christopher Graham's Claims by Missouri Bank and Trust.Responses due by 2/3/2014 (Thompson, Robert)
January 10, 2014 Filing 149 Memorandum in Opposition re #137 MOTION to Strike #66 Affidavit of Natalie C. Dempsey and Attached Exhibits filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Cowdery, James)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #147 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #128 MOTION to Compel Arbitration until January 29, 2014. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/10/2014. (Ghilardi, K.)
January 10, 2014 Filing 147 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #128 MOTION to Compel Arbitration until January 29, 2014 by North American Banking Company. (Doroghazi, John)
January 9, 2014 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Cowdery, James)
January 8, 2014 Filing 145 Memorandum in Opposition re #128 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #141 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #114 MOTION to Dismiss , Rule 12(b)(6)-(7) and 19 Motion to Dismiss, #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. MOTION to Stay, #109 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), #107 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 21. MOTION to Sever. Responses due by 2/5/2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/30/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #140 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #121 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 1/27/2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/30/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #138 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 13, 2014 to respond to the complaint #1 Complaint,. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/30/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
December 27, 2013 Filing 141 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant BMO Harris Bank as to #114 MOTION to Dismiss , Rule 12(b)(6)-(7) and 19 Motion to Dismiss, #109 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), #107 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 21. MOTION to Sever, #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. MOTION to Stay until 1/15/14 and 2/5/14 (see text of motion) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
December 26, 2013 Filing 140 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #121 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss until January 27, 2014 by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
December 24, 2013 Filing 139 Memorandum in Support re #109 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) Defendant BMO Harris Bank, N.A.'S Supplement to its Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Mancini, A.)
December 20, 2013 Filing 138 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 13, 2014 to respond to the complaint #1 Complaint, by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Thompson, Robert)
December 20, 2013 Filing 137 MOTION to Strike #66 Affidavit of Natalie C. Dempsey and Attached Exhibits by Ellen Russo.Responses due by 1/10/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Grenon, Karen)
December 20, 2013 Filing 136 Memorandum in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #133 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin Ranlett to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; granting #134 Motion to Appear MOTION for Attorney(s) John C. Ekman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2013. (Perez, J.)
December 19, 2013 Filing 134 MOTION for Attorney(s) John C. Ekman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3101922) by First Premier Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zeitlin, Andrew)
December 19, 2013 Filing 133 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin Ranlett to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3101839) by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Ranlett, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mancini, A.)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #127 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/19/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Stay Discovery And All Other Deadlines Set Forth In The Order On Pre-Trial Deadlines Pending Disposition Of Defendant National Bank Of California's Motion To Dismiss ; granting #71 Motion for to Modify the Oct. 4, 2013 Pretrial Deadlines Order; granting #73 Motion For Modify Pretrial Deadlines Order; granting #80 Motion to Amend/Correct 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Defendant North American Banking Company's Motion to Modify the October 4, 2013 Order on Pretrial Deadlines; granting #86 Motion to Modify the October 4, 2013 Order on Pretrial Deadlines re 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines; granting #88 MOTION for to Modify The October 4, 2013 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Order. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/19/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
December 18, 2013 Filing 130 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Missouri Bank and Trust identifying Corporate Parent MBT Bancshares for Missouri Bank and Trust. (Cesare, Christine)
December 18, 2013 Filing 129 Memorandum in Opposition re #71 MOTION for to Modify the Oct. 4, 2013 Pretrial Deadlines Order, #80 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Defendant North American Banking Company's Motion to Modify the October 4, 2013 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #88 MOTION for to Modify The October 4, 2013 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Order, #73 MOTION for Modify Pretrial Deadlines Order, #86 MOTION to Modify the October 4, 2013 Order on Pretrial Deadlines re #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines filed by Christopher Graham. (Kaplan, Darren)
December 18, 2013 Filing 128 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by North American Banking Company.Responses due by 1/8/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Peter Schwingler, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration)(Rinehart, Kim)
December 18, 2013 Filing 127 MOTION for Attorney(s) James P. McCarthy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3100317) by First Premier Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zeitlin, Andrew)
December 18, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan R. Freeman on behalf of First Premier Bank (Freeman, Bryan)
December 18, 2013 SetDeadlines as to #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 1/9/2014 (Ghilardi, K.)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #104 MOTION for Extension of Time Extending Deadlnies re #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/18/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #118 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryan R. Freeman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by First Premier Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion). Signed by Clerk on 12/17/13. (Torrenti, R.)
December 16, 2013 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grinalds, Maura)
December 16, 2013 Filing 122 Memorandum in Support re #121 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss filed by First Premier Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Zeitlin, Andrew)
December 16, 2013 Filing 121 MOTION to Compel , MOTION to Stay , MOTION to Dismiss by First Premier Bank.Responses due by 1/6/2014 (Zeitlin, Andrew)
December 16, 2013 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #97 MOTION for Attorney(s) James R. McGuire to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3095622) by First International Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cowdery, James)
December 16, 2013 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #118 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryan R. Freeman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3096943) by First Premier Bank. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
December 16, 2013 Filing 118 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryan R. Freeman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3096943) by First Premier Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion)(Zeitlin, Andrew)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lucia Nale to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Lucia Nale for BMO Harris Bank N.A. added.; granting #106 Motion to Appear MOTION for Attorney(s) Debra Bogo-Ernst to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Attorney Debra Bogo-Ernst for BMO Harris Bank N.A. added.. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2013. (Perez, J.)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Appear MOTION for Attorney(s) James R. McGuire to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Attorney James R. McGuire for First International Bank & Trust added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/14/2014. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2013. (Perez, J.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 115 Memorandum in Support re #114 MOTION to Dismiss , Rule 12(b)(6)-(7) and 19 Motion to Dismiss filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mancini, A.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss , Rule 12(b)(6)-(7) and 19 Motion to Dismiss by BMO Harris Bank N.A..Responses due by 1/3/2014 (Mancini, A.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 113 EXHIBIT Declaration of Kevin Ranlett in Support by BMO Harris Bank N.A. re #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mancini, A.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 112 Memorandum in Support re #111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mancini, A.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 111 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. by BMO Harris Bank N.A..Responses due by 1/3/2014 (Mancini, A.). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/16/2013 (Perez, J.).
December 13, 2013 Filing 110 Memorandum in Support re #109 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - PT. 1, #4 Exhibit 3 - PT. 2, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Mancini, A.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Mancini, A.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 108 Memorandum in Support re #107 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 21. filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Mancini, A.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever Pursuant to FRCP 21. by BMO Harris Bank N.A..Responses due by 1/3/2014 (Mancini, A.). Added MOTION to Sever on 12/16/2013 (Perez, J.).
December 13, 2013 Filing 106 MOTION for Attorney(s) Debra Bogo-Ernst to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3096507) by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Debra Bogo-Ernst, #2 Cert. of Admission For Debra Bogo-Ernst)(Mancini, A.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lucia Nale to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3096506) by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lucia Nale, #2 Cert. of Admission FOr Lucia Nale)(Mancini, A.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 104 MOTION for Extension of Time Extending Deadlnies re #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel by First International Bank & Trust. (Lin, Rita)
December 13, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Balassone on behalf of First International Bank & Trust (Balassone, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2013 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth Balassone, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3076473) by First International Bank & Trust. (Balassone, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita Lin on behalf of First International Bank & Trust (Lin, Rita)
December 13, 2013 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rita Lin, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3076445) by First International Bank & Trust. (Lin, Rita)
December 13, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley N. Gillard on behalf of Missouri Bank and Trust of Ashley N. Gillard (Gillard, Ashley)
December 13, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Missouri Bank and Trust Robert M. Thompson (Thompson, Robert)
December 13, 2013 Filing 97 MOTION for Attorney(s) James R. McGuire to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3095622) by First International Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tab A)(Cowdery, James)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #94 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ashley N. Gillard to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; granting #95 Motion to Appear MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert M. Thompson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2013. (Perez, J.)
December 12, 2013 Filing 95 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert M. Thompson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3094952) by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Robert M. Thompson in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cesare, Christine)
December 12, 2013 Filing 94 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ashley N. Gillard to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3094832) by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ashley N. Gillard in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cesare, Christine)
December 10, 2013 Filing 93 RESPONSE re #91 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Defendants' Statement in Response to Plaintiffs' Report of Parties' Planning Conference) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., First International Bank & Trust, First Premier Bank, Missouri Bank and Trust, National Bank of California, N.A., North American Banking Company. (Mancini, A.)
December 9, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison P. Baker on behalf of First Premier Bank (Baker, Alison)
December 9, 2013 Filing 91 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Grenon, Karen)
December 6, 2013 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to #68 MOTION to Stay Discovery And All Other Deadlines Set Forth In The Order On Pre-Trial Deadlines Pending Disposition Of Defendant National Bank Of California's Motion To Dismiss, Filed filed by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grinalds, Maura)
December 6, 2013 Answer deadline updated for BMO Harris Bank N.A. to 12/13/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #87 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/13/13 To Respond To The Class Action #1 Complaint,. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/6/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
December 5, 2013 Filing 88 MOTION for to Modify The October 4, 2013 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Order by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Mancini, A.)
December 4, 2013 Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/13/13 To Respond To The Class Action #1 Complaint, by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Mancini, A.)
December 4, 2013 Filing 86 MOTION to Modify the October 4, 2013 Order on Pretrial Deadlines re #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines by Missouri Bank and Trust.Responses due by 12/25/2013 (Cesare, Christine)
December 4, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine B. Cesare on behalf of Missouri Bank and Trust (Cesare, Christine)
December 3, 2013 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Mancini, A.)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #67 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/16/2013(Unopposed) to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/2/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
December 2, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 12/16/2013 (Ghilardi, K.)
December 2, 2013 Filing 82 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by First International Bank & Trust. (Cowdery, James)
December 2, 2013 Filing 81 Memorandum in Opposition re #68 MOTION to Stay Discovery And All Other Deadlines Set Forth In The Order On Pre-Trial Deadlines Pending Disposition Of Defendant National Bank Of California's Motion To Dismiss, Filed filed by Christopher Graham. (Kaplan, Darren)
November 27, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Defendant North American Banking Company's Motion to Modify the October 4, 2013 Order on Pretrial Deadlines by North American Banking Company.Responses due by 12/18/2013 (Schwingler, Peter)
November 27, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by A. John P. Mancini on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Mancini, A.)
November 27, 2013 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kyle M. Fisher to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070924) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 27, 2013 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #51 MOTION for Attorney(s) John H. Beisner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070916) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 27, 2013 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #50 MOTION for Attorney(s) John F. Friedemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070895) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 27, 2013 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica D. Miller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070859) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 27, 2013 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anand S. Raman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070828) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 27, 2013 Filing 73 MOTION for Modify Pretrial Deadlines Order by First Premier Bank. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
November 27, 2013 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Premier Bank identifying Corporate Parent United National Corporation for First Premier Bank. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
November 27, 2013 Filing 71 MOTION for to Modify the Oct. 4, 2013 Pretrial Deadlines Order by First International Bank & Trust. (Cowdery, James)
November 27, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Zeitlin on behalf of First Premier Bank (Zeitlin, Andrew)
November 26, 2013 Filing 69 Memorandum in Support re #68 MOTION to Stay Discovery And All Other Deadlines Set Forth In The Order On Pre-Trial Deadlines Pending Disposition Of Defendant National Bank Of California's Motion To Dismiss, Filed filed by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 26, 2013 Filing 68 MOTION to Stay Discovery And All Other Deadlines Set Forth In The Order On Pre-Trial Deadlines Pending Disposition Of Defendant National Bank Of California's Motion To Dismiss, Filed by National Bank of California, N.A..Responses due by 12/17/2013 (Grinalds, Maura)
November 26, 2013 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/16/2013(Unopposed) to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 25, 2013 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT re #65 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration Signed By Rita Lin, Esq. filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cowdery, James)
November 25, 2013 Filing 65 Memorandum in Support re #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Cowdery, James)
November 25, 2013 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by First International Bank & Trust.Responses due by 12/16/2013 (Cowdery, James). Added MOTION to Compel on 11/26/2013 (Perez, J.).
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/24/2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/25/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth Balassone, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3076473) by First International Bank & Trust. (Cowdery, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rita Lin, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3076445) by First International Bank & Trust. (Cowdery, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Cowdery on behalf of First International Bank & Trust (Cowdery, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by John P D'Ambrosio on behalf of First International Bank & Trust (D'Ambrosio, John)
November 21, 2013 Filing 58 Memorandum in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/20/2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/21/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/20/2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/21/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
November 20, 2013 Filing 55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter J. Schwingler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3073151) by North American Banking Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Peter J. Schwingler in Support of Motion for Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Doroghazi, John)
November 20, 2013 Filing 54 MOTION for Attorney(s) Todd A. Noteboom to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3073132) by North American Banking Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Todd A. Noteboom in Support of Motion for Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Doroghazi, John)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificates of Good Standing due by 1/19/2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/20/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kyle M. Fisher to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070924) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 19, 2013 Filing 51 MOTION for Attorney(s) John H. Beisner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070916) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 19, 2013 Filing 50 MOTION for Attorney(s) John F. Friedemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070895) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 19, 2013 Filing 49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica D. Miller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070859) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 19, 2013 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anand S. Raman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3070828) by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
November 15, 2013 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Missouri Bank and Trust waiver sent on 11/14/2013, answer due 1/13/2014 filed by Missouri Bank and Trust. (Cesare, Christine)
November 15, 2013 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Russo, Christopher Graham. First International Bank & Trust served on 10/21/2013, answer due 11/11/2013. (Grenon, Karen)
November 12, 2013 Answer deadline updated for North American Banking Company to 12/18/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/12/13. (Welles, T.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve N. Six on behalf of Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo (Six, Steve)
November 11, 2013 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to First Premier Bank waiver sent on 10/16/2013, answer due 12/15/2013 filed by Christopher Graham. (Kaplan, Darren)
November 7, 2013 Filing 42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 18, 2013 to Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 Complaint, by North American Banking Company. (Doroghazi, John)
November 7, 2013 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Banking Company identifying Corporate Parent N.A. Corporation for North American Banking Company. (Doroghazi, John)
November 7, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Doroghazi on behalf of North American Banking Company (Doroghazi, John)
November 7, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim E. Rinehart on behalf of North American Banking Company (Rinehart, Kim)
November 5, 2013 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #35 MOTION for Attorney(s) John A. Moore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3052596) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
November 4, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by John Austin Moore on behalf of Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo (Moore, John)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/3/2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/4/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney(s) John A. Moore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3052596) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
November 1, 2013 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Russo, Christopher Graham. Missouri Bank and Trust served on 10/18/2013, answer due 11/8/2013. (Grenon, Karen)
October 31, 2013 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Bank of California, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent NCAL Bancorp for National Bank of California, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grinalds, Maura)
October 31, 2013 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Bank of California, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grinalds, Maura)
October 31, 2013 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by National Bank of California, N.A..Responses due by 11/21/2013 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grinalds, Maura)
October 31, 2013 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steve N. Six to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3045094) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 30, 2013 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Russo, Christopher Graham. North American Banking Company served on 10/18/2013, answer due 11/8/2013. (Kaplan, Darren)
October 29, 2013 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BMO Harris Bank N.A. waiver sent on 10/8/2013, answer due 12/7/2013 filed by Christopher Graham; Ellen Russo. (Kaplan, Darren)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Steve N. Six to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/27/2013. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/28/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steve N. Six to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3045094) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 24, 2013 Filing 25 RICO Case Statement by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 22, 2013 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Darren T. Kaplan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028825) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 21, 2013 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey M. Ostrow to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3027724) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2013 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) James C. Shah to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028812) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 11, 2013 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hassan Z. Zavareei to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028836) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 10, 2013 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey D. Kaliel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3029013) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 10, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Shah on behalf of Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo (Shah, James)
October 10, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren T. Kaplan on behalf of Christopher Graham and Ellen Russo (Kaplan, Darren)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey D. Kaliel. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/9/2013. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/10/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Hassan Z. Zavareei. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/9/2013. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/10/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Darren T. Kaplan. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/9/2013. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/10/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney James C. Shah. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/9/2013. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/10/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey M. Ostrow to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/8/2013. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2013. (Perez, J.)
October 9, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey D. Kaliel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3029013) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 9, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hassan Z. Zavareei to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028836) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 9, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Darren T. Kaplan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028825) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 9, 2013 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) James C. Shah to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3028812) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 8, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey M. Ostrow to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3027724) by Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo. (Grenon, Karen)
October 8, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Miller on behalf of Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo (Miller, James)
October 7, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Leser Grenon on behalf of Christopher Graham, Ellen Russo (Grenon, Karen)
October 7, 2013 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *BMO Harris Bank N.A., First International Bank & Trust, First Premier Bank, Missouri Bank and Trust, National Bank of California, N.A., North American Banking Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Karen Leser Grenon* *Sheperd Finkelman Miller & Shah, LLP-CT* *65 Main St.* *Chester, CT 06412*. (Fazekas, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Ellen Russo, Christopher Graham, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/7/2013.(Fazekas, J.)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/4/2013.(Fazekas, J.)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/4/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2013. Discovery due by 4/5/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 5/5/2014 Signed by Clerk on 10/4/2013.(Fazekas, J.)
October 4, 2013 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Malone, P.)
October 4, 2013 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Grenon, Karen)
October 4, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMO Harris Bank, N.A., First International Bank & Trust, First Premier Bank, Missouri Bank and Trust, National Bank of California, N.A., North American Banking Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3024392.), filed by Ellen Russo, Christopher Graham.(Grenon, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham et al v. BMO Harris Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bank of California, N.A.
Represented By: John H. Beisner
Represented By: Jessica D. Miller
Represented By: Maura Barry Grinalds
Represented By: Anand S. Raman
Represented By: Kyle M. Fisher
Represented By: John F. Friedemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Bank and Trust
Represented By: Ashley N. Gillard
Represented By: Michael P. Carey
Represented By: Christine B. Cesare
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Debra Bogo-Ernst
Represented By: Kevin Ranlett
Represented By: A. John P. Mancini
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Banking Company
Represented By: Peter J. Schwingler
Represented By: Todd A. Noteboom
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First International Bank & Trust
Represented By: Rita Lin
Represented By: Elizabeth Balassone
Represented By: James R. McGuire
Represented By: John P. D'Ambrosio
Represented By: James T. Cowdery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Premier Bank
Represented By: James P. McCarthy
Represented By: Andrew M. Zeitlin
Represented By: Bryan R. Freeman
Represented By: Rita Lin
Represented By: Alison P. Baker
Represented By: John C. Ekman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Graham
Represented By: Hassan A. Zavareei
Represented By: Darren T. Kaplan
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Steve N. Six
Represented By: John Austin Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Kaliel
Represented By: Karen Leser Grenon
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: James E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Russo
Represented By: Hassan A. Zavareei
Represented By: Darren T. Kaplan
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Steve N. Six
Represented By: John Austin Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Kaliel
Represented By: Karen Leser Grenon
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: James E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?