Principal National Life Insurance Company v. Hadden et al

Plaintiff: Principal National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: J.C. David Hadden and Emily C. Coassin
Case Number: 3:2013cv01520
Filed: October 16, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Judgment is entered in Defendants' favor on both Principal's claims and Defendants' cross-claims. Principal is ordered to pay damages to Defendants in the amount of $10,000,000. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/25/2016.(Harris, J)
January 15, 2016 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion 99 in Limine Regarding Medical Records is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. No medical records dated after June 2012 will be admitted with the exception of Exhibits 17, 18, 20, 26, and 27 to the extent discussed in the attached ruling. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/15/16. (Harris, J)
December 11, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion 100 in Limine regarding Neal Halder is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Mr. Halder will be permitted to testify, but his testimony will be limited to describing Principal's past practices with respect to accep ting oral opinions of doctors. Defendants' Motion 101 in Limine regarding Michelle Palmer is GRANTED. Ms. Palmer will not be permitted to testify about what she would have done had she known Mr. Coassin's true medical history. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/11/15. (Harris, J)
September 25, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion 86 for Leave to File a Jury Trial Demand is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/25/15. (Harris, J)
December 5, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ELECTRONIC RULING on Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Protective Order as to the Location of Depositions of Plaintiff's Witnesses and Request for Expedited Ruling. The depositions on Tuesday, December 9, 2014 and Thursday, December 11, 2014 will be held in Hartford. The deposition on Wednesday, December 10, 2014 will be held in New Haven (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/5/14. (Malone, A.)
December 1, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ELECTRONIC RULING denying 37 Motion to Compel (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/1/14. (Malone, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principal National Life Insurance Company v. Hadden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay S. Blumenkopf
Represented By: Julie M. Cloney
Represented By: Bruce H. Raymond
Represented By: Jay M. Wolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. David Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily C. Coassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?