MedPricer.com, Inc. v. Becton, Dickinson and Co
Plaintiff: MedPricer.com, Inc.
Defendant: Becton, Dickinson & Co
Case Number: 3:2013cv01545
Filed: October 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Shea
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER. For the reasons stated herein, MedPricer's 96 motion for reconsideration is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part but the relief requested is DENIED. Becton's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Children's Hospital tr ansaction is GRANTED. The 97 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. The 105 Amended Motion to Seal is GRANTED, and the 103 Motion to Seal is DENIED as moot.The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/3/2017. (Connelly, L.)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. For the reasons stated herein, Defendant's 62 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part, and Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Within 14 day s, Defendant shall submit any supplemental evidence into the record related solely to the question of whether Children's Hospital of Alabama provides services for which payment may be made under a federal health care program. Plaintiff will the n have 7 days to respond to Defendant's filing. The Court will treat these filings as renewals of the remainder of the summary judgment motions and will proceed to rule on them. If no filings are made, the Court will treat the motions as renewed and rule on them on the existing record. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/6/2017. (Connelly, L.)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. As set forth herein, Defendant's 23 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/25/14. (Khan, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedPricer.com, Inc. v. Becton, Dickinson and Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedPricer.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becton, Dickinson & Co
Represented By: Lee Friend Lizotte
Represented By: David A. Reif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?