Beyer et al v. Anchor Insulation Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Beyer and Monica Beyer
Defendant: Anchor Insulation Co., Inc., Johns Manville, Inc. and Icynene Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv01576
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New London
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, Plaintiffs' Motion 278 to Amend the Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 03/03/2017. (Farrelly, S.)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, Plaintiffs' Motion 224 to Strike Expert Witnesses is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 02/28/2017. (Farrelly, S.)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motion 192 to preclude the testimony of Gary Cude is granted in part and denied in part; Defendant's Motion 194 to preclude the testimony of Dr. Yuh-Chin Huang is gran ted; Defendant's Motion 195 to preclude the testimony of Dr. David Nicewicz is granted in part and denied in part, and Defendant's Motion 189 for summary judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 02/17/2017. (Farrelly, S.)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 RULING granting 140 Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike Expert Reports and Testing Results of Plaintiffs' Expert Gary Cude. (See Attached.) Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 9/8/2016. (Saffir, Jaclyn)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, Plaintiffs' Objection to the Ruling on Sanctions 130 is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/30/2016. (Farrelly, S.)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, Plaintiffs' Objection to Ruling on Motion to Strike 130 is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/26/2016. (Farrelly, S.)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RULING: granting in part and denying in part 158 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/9/16. (Campbell, A)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 RULING granting 123 Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike. (See Attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on July 6, 2016. (Saffir, Jaclyn)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RULING granting in part to the extent set forth in the attached Ruling 112 Motion for Sanctions and 115 Motion for Sanctions; and denying 117 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/26/16. (Malone, A.)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice as moot plaintiff's 101 Motion for Protective Order (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/8/2016. (Malone, A.)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER; Anchor's Motion 46 to Dismiss Count Five and Icynene's Motion 51 to Dismiss Count Eleven are GRANTED. Johns Manville's Motion 49 to Dismiss is GRANTED as to Count Eight and DENIED as to Counts Six and Seven. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/28/2014. (Morril, Gregory)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beyer et al v. Anchor Insulation Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Beyer
Represented By: Michael J. McCabe
Represented By: Dawn Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Beyer
Represented By: Michael J. McCabe
Represented By: Dawn Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Insulation Co., Inc.
Represented By: Beck S. Fineman
Represented By: Robert O. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Manville, Inc.
Represented By: John P DiManno
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: John P DiManno
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icynene Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?