Strauch et al v. Computer Sciences Corp
Plaintiff: Joseph Strauch, Timothy Colby, Stephen King, Hassell D. Stacy, Christian G. Rothrock, Grover C. Boone, Sr., Stephan A. Cheney, Brandon Kimas and Chris Lamer
Defendant: Computer Sciences Corp
Case Number: 3:2014cv00956
Filed: July 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting 554 Plaintiffs' Motion for Notice and Tolling. The Court orders the dismissal of the Ineligible Opt-Ins' claims and tolls the time for their asserting any individual claims for a period of sixty days from the entry of this order. The Court approves Plaintiffs' proposed Rule 23 Notice and directs its dissemination to the thirty individuals identified in the List of Unnoticed Class Members. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/29/20.(Gutierrez, A.)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER denying Class Counsel's 521 Motion for Protective Order and to Seal 522 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Jahan C. Sagafi. The Court directs the Clerk to unseal 522 Exhibit Q. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/9/20. (Gutierrez, A.)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER: The Court's Ruling on Remedies is attached. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference on December 5, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the conference call to chambers: 203-773-2737. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/9/18.(Kolker, J.)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, Defendant's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law 446 is DENIED and Defendant's Third Motion to Decertify 447 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/21/2018. (Kolker, J.)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, Defendant's Second Motion 373 to Decertify Rule 23 Classes is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/30/2017. (Kolker, J.)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER denying 343 Motion Decertification of Rule 23 Class. As set forth in the Order, Plaintiffs are directed to file amended complaint within five days. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/18/17. (Kolker, J.)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, Plaintiffs' Motion 323 to Certify State Law Classes is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 06/30/2017. (Farrelly, S.)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER: The Court overrules Defendant's Objection 173 and approves and adopts the Ruling on Number of Depositions 171 limiting the number of depositions to 60, under the time limit imposed in Scheduling Order 256 . Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/8/16. (Harris, J)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 RULING REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION: re 262 Notice (Other) filed by Vernon Carre, Charles Turner, Joseph Strauch, Timothy Colby, 263 Notice (Other) filed by Computer Sciences Corp, 265 Response filed by Vernon Carre, Charles Turner, Joseph Strauch, Timothy Colby, 266 Response filed by Computer Sciences Corp. (SEE ATTACHED) Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/124/2015.(Watson, M.)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 SCHEDULING ORDER (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 10/20/2015.(Malone, A.)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER: Plaintiffs' proposed reminder notice is approved with the following changes: (1) the sentence "CSC management confirms that you may view this email and the www.csclawsuit.com website at work and, if you wish, forward this email to y our personal email" will be struck from the text of the email; (2) the reminder notice email will consist of a short introduction using the agreed upon language, to which the reminder notice and consent to join form will be attached; (3) the sen tence "I also consent to join any separate or subsequent action to assert my claims against CSC, and/or any related entities or persons potentially liable" will be struck from the reminder notice. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/14/15.(Poueymirou, M)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RULING On Number of Depositions (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 06/10/2015.(Malone, A.)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RULING Following In Camera Review (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 05/08/15.(Malone, A.)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RULING Following In Camera Review (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/26/15.(Malone, A.)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Following the Telephone Conference Held on 2/13/15 (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/23/15.(Malone, A.)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RULING granting in part and denying in part defendant's 120 Motion to Compel (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/10/15. (Malone, A.)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RULING granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 98 Motion to Compel (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/06/15. (Malone, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strauch et al v. Computer Sciences Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Strauch
Represented By: Michael N Litrownik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Colby
Represented By: Michael N Litrownik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassell D. Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian G. Rothrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grover C. Boone, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan A. Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Kimas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Sciences Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?