GEOMC Co, Ltd. v. Competitive Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: GEOMC Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Competitive Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv01222
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER denying 322 Motion to Quash. For the reasons described in the attached order and ruling, the motion to quash is DENIED. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/30/2020. (Millat, C.)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER. The Court in the attached Ruling and Order resolves the discovery disputes outlined in the parties' 261 Joint Motion and 321 Joint Status Report. The Court also sets forth the following schedule: -To the extent that the partie s require further discovery, they are directed to meet and confer regarding the scope of remaining discovery needed in light of this Ruling and Order. To the extent the parties cannot agree on what remains to be produced, they may move for a discover y conference by November 20, 2020.-The parties are also ordered, by November 20, 2020, to file a joint status report. The status report should include outstanding discovery issues, if any, left unresolved by this Ruling and Order, a s well as a proposed schedule. The proposed schedule should include dates for the close of discovery, a post-discovery telephonic status conference, the filing of dispositive motions, any responses or replies to any dispositive motions, the joint trial memorandum, and trial-ready date. -The Court will hold a telephonic scheduling conference on November 24, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/13/2020. (Millat, C.)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 219 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/25/2018. (McDonough, S.)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER setting forth findings of fact and conclusions of law under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(a)(1). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/29/2017. (Williams, C)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER regarding evidentiary disputes; granting 191 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/22/2017. (Williams, C)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/18/2017. (Williams, C)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/25/2017. (Williams, C)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/19/2016. (Williams, C)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/15/2015. (LaPre, E.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEOMC Co, Ltd. v. Competitive Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEOMC Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lawrence S. Grossman
Represented By: David A. Slossberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Competitive Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?