Coan et al v. Dunne et al
Plaintiff: Richard M. Coan and National Asset Loan Management Limited
Defendant: Sean Dunne, Gayle Killilea, Mountbrook USA, LLC, Molly Blossom LLC, Barclay Beattie & Brown, LLC, Wahl, LLC, Thomas Heagney, John Slane and Heagney Lennon & Slane, LLP
Case Number: 3:2015cv00050
Filed: January 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A. Meyer
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 698 OMNIBUS RULING ON POST-TRIAL ISSUES. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the Court: -- DENIES Sean Dunne's motion for post-verdict relief (Doc. # 570 ) in its entirety. -- GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Trus tee's motion for prejudgment interest (Doc. # 627 ). Prejudgment interest shall be awarded to the Trustee against Killilea in the total amount of 1,407,229.60 Euros. In light of the mathematical complexity of the prejudgment interest award calcu lations in this case, if any party believes that this ruling is based upon a clear computational error, they are encouraged to file a timely motion for reconsideration or motion to re-open the judgment rather than litigating a claimed error of math i n the first instance on appeal. -- DENIES the Trustee the relief he seeks in his brief on equitable claims (Doc. # 524 ). -- OVERRULES as moot the Killilea defendants' objection to Judge Garfinkel's ruling on the Trustee� 39;s motion for post-verdict, prejudgment remedies (Doc. # 647 ). -- GRANTS Killilea and Wahl's motion to discharge the lis pendens (Doc. # 629 ) on 22 Stillman Lane subject to their proposed stipulation and representations that the proceeds of any sale of the property will be provided to the Trustee to secure and/or satisfy the judgment in this case. I have considered all other arguments raised by the parties in relation to these issues even if the arguments are no t expressly discussed in this ruling. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment on July 19, 2021 in accordance with the jury's verdict (Doc. # 509 ) as well as this ruling. Final judgment shall enter against Killilea in the total amount of 19,172,935.60 Euros and $278,297.18. Upon separate entry of judgment, the Clerk of Court shall close this case. If any party has a good-faith basis to file a motion for reconsideration or a motion to re-open the judgment consistent with the limitations discussed in this ruling, they may file such a motion by no later than 14 days from the entry of judgment. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/15/2021. (DeBot, B.)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 642 RULING and ORDER granting 621 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Post-Verdict Prejudgment Remedies Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 64 and Connecticut law.ORDER granting Motion for an Updated Asset Disclosure. Defendant Killilea will comply with t his ruling and order within fourteen (14) days.It is further ORDERED that Defendant Killilea is enjoined from using, reducing, diminishing, transferring, disposing of, and/or dissipating assets or property while Defendant Killilea complies with the Court's order to satisfy the Post-Verdict Prejudgment Remedy.Signed by Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 1/28/21. (Esposito, A.)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN WYLIE. For the reasons stated in the accompanying ruling, the Trustee's motion in limine to preclude the testimony of John Wylie (Doc. # 361 ) is GRANT ED IN PART insofar as Wylie may not offer testimony that refers to or comments on the evidence in this case, and is DENIED IN PART insofar as Wylie may testify to the general background principles of Irish property, trust, and conveyancing law consistent with those legal principles stated in defendants' revised disclosure. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/17/2019. (Rubin, N.)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER DENYING TRUSTEE'S MOTIONS RE FOREIGN JUDGMENTS. For the reasons stated in the accompanying ruling, the Trustee's motions to introduce the High Court's judgment as evidence (Doc. # 461 ) and for collateral estoppel as to the High Court's judgment (Doc. # 471 ) are DENIED. The Trustee may, however, engage in a limited cross-examination of Dunne as to the High Court's findings as described in this ruling. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/15/2019. (Rubin, N.)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TRUSTEE'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE HANDWRITTEN DOCUMENTS. For the reasons stated in the accompanying ruling, the Trustee's motion to preclude the introduction of handwritten documents (Doc. # 365 ) is DENIED without prejudice to particularized renewal at trial.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/9/2019. (Rubin, N.)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER RE ADMISSION OF FAMILY LAW DOCUMENTS. For the reasons stated in the accompanying ruling, except to the extent that this ruling allows for defendants to interpose certain objections to Exhibits #1143, #2122 and #2123, the Court DENIES defendants ' motions in limine to preclude admission of family law documents (Docs. # 445 and # 457 ). The Court GRANTS the Trustee's motion to seal and protect the confidentiality of the family law documents (Doc. # 417 ).Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/6/2019. (Rubin, N.)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 447 OMNIBUS RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE. For the reasons stated in the accompanying ruling, defendants' motions to preclude evidence as to Amrakbo (Doc. # 368 ); Newinvest, the Bloem Settlement, and Yesreb (Doc. # 370 ); and 151 Milbank (Doc. # 371 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as described in this ruling. Defendants' motion to preclude evidence as to the IGB Lands and Beara properties (Doc. # 375 ) is DENIED. Defendants' motions to preclude evidence as to Lagoon Beach and Belgravia (Doc. # 372 ); and as to subsequent transfers (Doc. # 382 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as described in this ruling. John Dunne's motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. # 374 ) is DENIED. Defendants' motion to preclude the 151 Milbank deposition testimony of Gayle Killilea (Doc. # 373 ) is DENIED. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/3/2019. (Rubin, N.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER DENYING TRUSTEE'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 37(e)(1). For the reasons stated in the accompanying ruling, the Trustee's motion for contempt (Doc. # 70 ) is DENIED. The Court finds that Dunne 's loss of electronic records was negligent, and so imposes curative measures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(e)(1) as described in this order. Dunne shall also furnish the documents over which he asserts the attorney-client privilege to Judge Sp ector for in camera review as described in this order. The Trustee shall furnish an itemized statement of costs and fees to counsel for Dunne on or before May 7, 2019, and Dunne shall pay within thirty days thereafter. Dunne shall continue to use an IT consultant to produce remaining responsive documents, and shall bear the costs of doing so.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/16/2019. (Rubin, N.)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH. For the reasons stated in the accompanying ruling, defendants' motion to quash (Doc. # 205 ) is GRANTED as to any documents that are subject to a valid claim of attorney-client or work-product privilege. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/8/2019. (Rubin, N.)
March 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 RULING granting in part Motion to Overrule Defendants' Privilege Objections and Compel Production of Withheld Documents (Doc. 181). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 3/9/2019. (Watson, M.)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER RE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY RE ROSS CONNOLLY AND JAMES RYAN. For the reasons stated in the attached order, the Court GRANTS the Trustee's motion for letters rogatory (Doc. # 107 ), and it issues the attached letters rogatory as to Ross Connolly and James Ryan. Paper documents with original judge's signature to be mailed to counsel. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/23/2019. (Gondwe, N.) Modified doc type on 1/24/2019 (Pesta, J.).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER RE APPLICATIONS TO RETAIN COUNSEL. For the reasons stated in the accompanying ruling, the Trustee's motion to retain the law firm of Updike, Kelly, & Spellacy, P.C. (Doc. # 102 ) is DENIED, and the Trustee's motion to retain AMOSS Solicitors (Doc. # 104 ) is GRANTED. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/22/2019. (Rubin, N.)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 RULING on Defendants' Emergency Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. No. 137): granting in limited part as to John Dunne's post-March 2016 records for in camera review, denying as moot as to the request for additional time for compliance, and denying as to all remaining arguments. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 1/7/2019. (Watson, M.)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RULING granting in part and denying in part [Doc. No. 64] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 12/18/2018. (Watson, M.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coan et al v. Dunne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard M. Coan
Represented By: Timothy D. Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Asset Loan Management Limited
Represented By: Peter Antonelli
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Killilea
Represented By: Liam S. Burke
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountbrook USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Blossom LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclay Beattie & Brown, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wahl, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Heagney
Represented By: Philip D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Slane
Represented By: Philip D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heagney Lennon & Slane, LLP
Represented By: Philip D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?