This, LLC v. Jaccard Corporation et al
Plaintiff: This, LLC
Defendant: Jaccard Corporation and Fox Run USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv01606
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motion 121 for Sanctions is granted. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 02/09/2017. (Farrelly, S.)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, Defendant's Motion 113 to Preclude is denied. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 01/11/2017. (Farrelly, S.)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Defendant's motion to stay is GRANTED to permit the United States District Court for the Western District of New York to rule on the applicability of the first-filed rule.(Poueymirou, M)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: As set out on the record during the teleconference hearing held November 9, 2015, Plaintiff's Motion [Doc. # 3] for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. However, in light of Plaintiff's record supporting its claim of likelihood of success on the merits, Plaintiff's application for an order to show cause is GRANTED. (Poueymirou, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: This, LLC v. Jaccard Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaccard Corporation
Represented By: Edward P. Hourihan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Run USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: This, LLC
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?