Singh v. Cigna Corp et al
Plaintiff: Patel, Jyotindra Patel and Minohor Singh
Defendant: Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy, Herbert A. Fritch and Richard Appel
Petitioner: Randall Wilhelm
Case Number: 3:2016cv00182
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MANDATE of USCA dated 3/26/2019 Judgment Affirmed #81 Notice of Appeal filed by Minohor Singh. (Velez, F.)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: #81 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none. (Bozek, M.)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #80 Judgment by Minohor Singh. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0205-4583434. (Johnson, James)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 JUDGMENT.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms. Signed by Clerk on 10/02/2017. (Shafer, J.)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Dismiss for the reasons set forth in the attached decision. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/28/2017. (Lee, E.)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE by Minohor Singh re #77 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, of Intent not to Amend the Complaint (Johnson, James)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Third Amended Complaint due by 9/16/2017 per #77 Order. (Shafer, J.)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #74 Motion for Reconsideration pursuant to the attached ruling and order. Lead Plaintiff shall file a Third Amended Complaint on or before 09/16/2017. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/01/2017. (Lee, E.)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Memorandum in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order, dated August 28, 2017 filed by Richard Appel, Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Herbert A. Fritch, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Finn, Thomas)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Memorandum in Support re #74 MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order, dated August 28, 2017 filed by Minohor Singh. (Johnson, James)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order, dated August 28, 2017 by Minohor Singh. (Johnson, James)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: To comply with the Court's Order #34 , the Clerk is directed to reinstate Minohor Singh as a party in this action and correct the case caption to name Minohor Singh as named, lead plaintiff. Jyotindra Patel shall be terminated as the named plaintiff. This termination shall have no impact on his membership in the class or his right to recover as a class member. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/28/2017. (Lee, E.)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Lead Plaintiff is ordered to file a proposed amended complaint on or before 09/04/2017 for the Court's consideration in contemplation of the request for leave to amend as set forth in the Opposition on the Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, Dkt. #68 . Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/28/2017. (Lee, E.)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY to Response to #66 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Richard Appel, Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Herbert A. Fritch, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Finn, Thomas)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 04/27/2017. (Lee, E.)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to File Oversized Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Richard Appel, Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Herbert A. Fritch, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Finn, Thomas)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Memorandum in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Minohor Singh. (Johnson, James)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Memorandum in Support re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Richard Appel, Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Herbert A. Fritch, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Finn, Thomas)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Richard Appel, Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Herbert A. Fritch, Thomas A. McCarthy.Responses due by 3/6/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28)(Finn, Thomas)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to both parties' requests for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/23/2017. (Lee, E.)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to File Oversized Memoranda of Law in Support of and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Richard Appel, Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Herbert A. Fritch, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Finn, Thomas)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Heyworth on behalf of Richard Appel (Heyworth, James)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy J. Spenner on behalf of Richard Appel (Spenner, Dorothy)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Stern on behalf of Richard Appel (Stern, Andrew)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Cruz Cedillo on behalf of Richard Appel (Cedillo, Paula)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Finn on behalf of Richard Appel (Finn, Thomas)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Richard Appel* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James W. Johnson* *Labaton Sucharow LLP-NY* *140 Broadway, 33rd Floor* *New York, NY 10005*. (Shafer, J.)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Herbert A. Fritch, Thomas A. McCarthy, Richard Appel, filed by Minohor Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, James)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Richard Appel. (Johnson, James)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Set Pretrial Deadlines. Second Amended Complaint due 11/30/2016. Motion to Dismiss due 02/13/2017. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss due 04/13/2017. Reply papers due 05/13/2017. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/21/2016. (Lee, E.)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Joint MOTION To Set Pretrial Deadlines re 52 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Minohor Singh.Responses due by 11/10/2016 (Rogers, Michael)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference. Held on 10/7/14 before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Court Reporter: Suzanne Benoit. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2017. (Benoit, S.)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Telephonic Conference held on 10/7/16, Motion Hearing held on 10/7/16 re #50 MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines filed by Minohor Singh, 23 minutes.(Court Reporter F. Velez, ECRO.) (Fernandez, C.)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 10/21/2016, the parties shall jointly propose a new scheduling order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/07/2016. (Thomas, R.)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 OBJECTION re #50 MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines filed by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Herbert A. Fritch, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Finn, Thomas)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines by Minohor Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael H. Rogers)(Rogers, Michael)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. The Court schedules a Telephonic Conference for 10/7/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Thomas, R.)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Conference. A calendar notice will follow. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/23/2016. (Thomas, R.)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Herbert A. Fritch, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Finn, Thomas)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Heyworth on behalf of Herbert A. Fritch (Heyworth, James)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy J. Spenner on behalf of Herbert A. Fritch (Spenner, Dorothy)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Stern on behalf of Herbert A. Fritch (Stern, Andrew)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Cruz Cedillo on behalf of Herbert A. Fritch (Cedillo, Paula)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Finn on behalf of Herbert A. Fritch (Finn, Thomas)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Herbert A. Fritch* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David C. Shufrin* *Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC* *147 North Broad St., PO Box 112* *Milford, CT 06460-0112*. (Shafer, J.)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Minohor Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shufrin, David)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Attorney Michael H. Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #36 Motion for Attorney James W. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #37 Motion for Attorney James T. Christie to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #38 Motion for Attorney Matthew J. Hrutkay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2016. (Shafer, J.)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew J. Hrutkay to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034889) by Minohor Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shufrin, David)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) James T. Christie to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034883) by Minohor Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shufrin, David)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Attorney(s) James W. Johnson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034867) by Minohor Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shufrin, David)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael H. Rogers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4034830) by Minohor Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shufrin, David)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Please see attached. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/17/2016. (Thomas, R.)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Docket Entry Correction - 26(f) Notice 32 entered in error. (Fernandez, C.)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENTERED IN ERROR - 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 10 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before : May 27, 2016, (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26(f) report; or (2) a form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 05/13/16.(Fernandez, C.) Modified on 5/13/16 to say entered in error (Fernandez, C.).
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion of Minohor Singh for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Minohor Singh. (Shufrin, David)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying as moot #28 Motion to Appoint Counsel. See ECF No. #29 . Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 04/28/2016. (Thomas, R.)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE by Jyotindra Patel, Randall Wilhelm re #28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION OF RANDALL S. WILHELM AND JYOTINDRA PATEL FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL Notice of Withdrawal of Motion. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION OF RANDALL S. WILHELM AND JYOTINDRA PATEL FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL by Jyotindra Patel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion of Minohor Singh for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by Minohor Singh. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Michael W. Stocker, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Shufrin, David)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 MOTION for Attorney Andrew W. Stern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; granting #24 MOTION for Attorney Dorothy J. Spenner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; and granting #25 MOTION for Attorney James O. Heyworth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/1/2016. (Shafer, J.)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) James O. Heyworth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Finn, Thomas)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dorothy J. Spenner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Finn, Thomas)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew W. Stern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Finn, Thomas)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Docket Entry Correction re 22 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; corrected judge. (Shafer, J.)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling Motions #19 , #20 , and #21 MOTIONS for Attorney(s) Stern, Spenner, and Heyworth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Local Rule 83.1(d) requires the applicant to identify the corresponding bar identification number(s) each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/21/2016. (Shafer, J.) Modified on 3/24/2016 (Shafer, J.).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) James O. Heyworth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3937654) by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Finn, Thomas)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dorothy J. Spenner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3937645) by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Finn, Thomas)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew W. Stern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3937639) by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Finn, Thomas)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna Corp. (Finn, Thomas)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/15/2016. (Thomas, R.)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Finn, Thomas)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines by Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Finn, Thomas)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Cruz Cedillo on behalf of Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy (Cedillo, Paula)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Finn on behalf of Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy (Finn, Thomas)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 2/16/2016. (Shafer, J.)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeremy A. Lieberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3894918) by Jyotindra Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Tuccillo, Matthew)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Attorney J. Alexander Hood II to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2016. (Shafer, J.)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) J. Alexander Hood II to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3894104) by Jyotindra Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Tuccillo, Matthew)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cigna Corp, David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew L Tuccillo* *Pomerantz Haudek Grossman & Gross LLP* *100 Park Avenue, 26th Floor* *New York, NY 10017*. (Shafer, J.)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #2 Exhibit filed by Jyotindra Patel, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Complaint filed by Jyotindra Patel. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2016. (Shafer, J.)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/4/2016. (Shafer, J.)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/4/2016. (Shafer, J.)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/4/2016. (Shafer, J.)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 5/3/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2016. Discovery due by 8/5/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2016. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2016. (Shafer, J.)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Walker, A)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by Jyotindra Patel re #1 Complaint. (Tuccillo, Matthew)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cigna Corp., David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3886255.), filed by Jyotindra Patel.(Tuccillo, Matthew)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cigna Corp., David M. Cordani, Thomas A. McCarthy. (Tuccillo, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Cigna Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jyotindra Patel
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Matthew L Tuccillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minohor Singh
Represented By: James T. Christie
Represented By: James W. Johnson
Represented By: Matthew J. Hrutkay
Represented By: Michael H. Rogers
Represented By: David C. Shufrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Corp
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Dorothy J. Spenner
Represented By: James O. Heyworth
Represented By: Paula Cruz Cedillo
Represented By: Thomas J. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Cordani
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Dorothy J. Spenner
Represented By: James O. Heyworth
Represented By: Paula Cruz Cedillo
Represented By: Thomas J. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. McCarthy
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Dorothy J. Spenner
Represented By: James O. Heyworth
Represented By: Paula Cruz Cedillo
Represented By: Thomas J. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert A. Fritch
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Dorothy J. Spenner
Represented By: James O. Heyworth
Represented By: Paula Cruz Cedillo
Represented By: Thomas J. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Appel
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Represented By: Dorothy J. Spenner
Represented By: James O. Heyworth
Represented By: Paula Cruz Cedillo
Represented By: Thomas J. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randall Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?