DeAngelis v. Farinella et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery DeAngelis
Defendant: Monica Farinella, Ruiz, Ilona Figura, Janine Augusto, Antonio Santiago, Shabeneas and Scott Semple
Case Number: 3:2016cv00307
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New London
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. Defendants' 41 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted as to all claims against defendants Farinella, Ruiz, Semple, Augusto, and Santiago, all claims except the Eighth Amendment claim aga inst defendant Figura for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need by failing to seek direct transport, and all claims except the Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Sabenas for denying assistance. The case will proceed to trial against defendants Figura and Sabenas on these two claims. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/18/2017. (Mac Dougall, S.)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 The plaintiff's motions to compel 34 35 are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/10/2017. (Connelly, L.)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. The 42 Motion for Affidavit is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/20/2016. (Connelly, L.)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The plaintiffs motions to strike 20 21 22 are DENIED. The defendants motion for extension of time 24 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/18/2016. (Connelly, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeAngelis v. Farinella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery DeAngelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Farinella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilona Figura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine Augusto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shabeneas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Semple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?