Cicalo v. Hunt Leibert Jacobson, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Samuel M. Cicalo
Defendant: Hunt Leibert Jacobson, P.C. and Christopher J. Picard
Case Number: 3:2016cv00339
Filed: March 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Stefan R. Underhill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 85 Motion for Reconsideration but denying the requested relief. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/27/2018. (Schneider, K)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 73 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the defendants and close the case. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/10/2017. (Landman, M)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to dismiss the section 1692f and 1692g claims is granted; defendants' motion to dismiss the claim brought under section 1692e is denied. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/10/2017. (Landman, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cicalo v. Hunt Leibert Jacobson, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel M. Cicalo
Represented By: Joanne S. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Leibert Jacobson, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Picard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?