Kelly et al v. Honeywell International Inc.
Plaintiff: David Kelly, Richard Norko, Annette Dobbs and Peter Dellolio
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00543
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Employee Pension Plan
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND INVOCATION OF CONFIDENTIAL PROCEDURE FOR REMITTAL OF DISQUALIFICATION. In accordance with the attached notice, the Court advises the parties of the basis for potential disqualification and to allow the parties to decide on a confidential basis whether they wish to consent to remittal of disqualification. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/21/2020. (Al-Jarani, Y.)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Preliminary Injunction pursuant to the attached decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/27/2017. (Lee, E.)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 70 Motion for Reconsideration for the reasons set forth in the attached decision. The parties are ordered to file a status report within 21 days of the date of this Order stating whether there is presently a need for the Court to address the preliminary injunction previously found moot. The Clerk is directed to reopen this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/25/2017. (Lee, E.)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: The Court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendants with respect to plaintiffs who retired after the expiration of the Agreements. The parties are to refer to the attached order. The Clerk's Office is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 02/28/2017. (Lee, E.)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to the attached decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 02/08/2017. (Lee, E.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kelly
Represented By: Thomas W. Meiklejohn
Represented By: William Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Norko
Represented By: Thomas W. Meiklejohn
Represented By: William Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Dobbs
Represented By: Thomas W. Meiklejohn
Represented By: William Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Dellolio
Represented By: Thomas W. Meiklejohn
Represented By: William Wertheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?