Pagano v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pagano and Ashley Pagano
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00859
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2016 Filing 34 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of New Haven at New Haven. (Ferguson, L.)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order (Doc. No. #28 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/31/2016. (Rock, E)
August 25, 2016 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ferguson, L.)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. No. #23 ) is hereby GRANTED. This case is remanded to Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of New Haven at New Haven. The Clerk shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/25/2016. (Rock, E)
July 21, 2016 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Defendant's Opposition filed by Ashley Pagano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hayber, Richard)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: In the event that the Motion to Remand (Doc. No. #23 ) is denied, the opposition to the Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay Case (Doc. No. #24 ) will be due ten days after the date of the court's ruling on the motion to remand. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/21/2016. (Rock, E)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court (Doc. No. #26 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/20/2016. (Rock, E)
July 18, 2016 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 21 Days after Entry of the Court's Ruling Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Defendant's Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration to File Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (McIlwee, John)
July 7, 2016 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McIlwee, John)
June 27, 2016 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Ruling On Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court by Ashley Pagano.Responses due by 7/18/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hayber, Richard)
June 17, 2016 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay Case filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Leigh Tillman, #2 Affidavit Peter Koeller)(Siebert, Melissa)
June 17, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay Case by Ruby Tuesday, Inc..Responses due by 7/8/2016 (Siebert, Melissa)
June 16, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ashley Pagano.Responses due by 7/7/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Hayber, Richard)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bonnie L. Keane for Ruby Tuesday, Inc. added.. Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2016. (Enderlin, M.)
June 15, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bonnie K. Keane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4035164) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bonnie L. Keane, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/14/16.(Ferguson, L.)
June 8, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. McIlwee on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (McIlwee, John)
June 8, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Griswold on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Griswold, Joel)
June 8, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Siebert on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Siebert, Melissa)
June 8, 2016 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement Pursuant to 28 USC 1441 Signed By Anne C. LeVasseur filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (LeVasseur, Anne)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Melissa A. Siebert for Ruby Tuesday, Inc. added.. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/2016. (Enderlin, M.)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney John C. McIlwee for Ruby Tuesday, Inc. added.. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/2016. (Enderlin, M.)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joel Griswold for Ruby Tuesday, Inc. added.. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/2016. (Enderlin, M.)
June 7, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa A. Siebert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4025576) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Melissa A. Siebert, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 7, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) John C. Mcllwee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4025575) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John C. Mcllwee, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 7, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joel Griswold to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4025572) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joel Griswold, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 6, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Notice, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc., #4 Exhibit filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc., #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 6/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Enderlin, M.)
June 3, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE RE INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Enderlin, M.)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/3/2016.(Enderlin, M.)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/3/2016.(Enderlin, M.)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/3/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2016 Discovery due by 12/3/2016 Dispositive Motions due by 1/2/2017 Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2016.(Enderlin, M.)
June 3, 2016 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Walker, J.)
June 3, 2016 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (LeVasseur, Anne)
June 3, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 3, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (LeVasseur, Anne)
June 3, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, JD of New Haven, case number NNH-CV-16-6060021-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0205-4020900, filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court pleadings)(LeVasseur, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagano v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Siebert
Represented By: Bonnie L. Keane
Represented By: John C. McIlwee
Represented By: Philip H. Bieler
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Anne Casey LeVasseur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pagano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Pagano
Represented By: Richard Eugene Hayber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?