McAuliffe et al v. McAuliffe et al
Plaintiff: McAuliffe, Katherine McAuliffe and Kathleen McAuliffe
Defendant: Timothy McAuliffe, Gay Murdoch, Timothy Bailey, Kevin McAuliffe and Gloria M. Cady
Case Number: 3:2016cv01152
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2017 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Glynn, T.)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Approved. So ORDERED re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Kathleen McAuliffe, Katherine McAuliffe. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/13/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 12, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Moyher, Thomas)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On 12/1/2016, the Court ordered plaintiffs to file a memorandum on or before 12/15/2016 showing why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). There has been no response to the order. Plaintiffs are hereby notified that unless the memorandum is filed on or before 6/13/2016, this action will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notification. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/6/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: More than 120 have elapsed since the complaint was filed but plaintiffs have not made proof of service as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(1). Accordingly, plaintiffs are hereby ordered to file a memorandum on or before December 15, 2016, showing why this action should not be dismissed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/1/2016.(Rickevicius, L.)
July 12, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Kathleen McAuliffe, Katherine McAuliffe, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathleen McAuliffe, Katherine McAuliffe, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/16. (Sundie, T)
July 12, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Parkin on behalf of Katherine McAuliffe, Kathleen McAuliffe (Parkin, Christopher)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/11/16. (Sundie, T)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/11/16. (Attachments: #1 E-File Attachment) (Sundie, T)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2016. Discovery due by 1/10/2017. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/16. (Sundie, T)
July 11, 2016 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Walker, A)
July 11, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Katherine McAuliffe, Kathleen McAuliffe.(Basha, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAuliffe et al v. McAuliffe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McAuliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine McAuliffe
Represented By: Thomas W Moyher
Represented By: Chris Parkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen McAuliffe
Represented By: Thomas W Moyher
Represented By: Chris Parkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy McAuliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gay Murdoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAuliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria M. Cady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?