InteliClear, LLC v. Victor
Plaintiff: InteliClear, LLC
Defendant: Robert J. Victor
Case Number: 3:2016cv01403
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, the Court's Ruling 156 on Counterclaim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is VACATED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/24/17. (Denker, J.)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Ruling, Plaintiff-Counterclaim Defendants' Motion 89 to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/1/17. (Denker, J.)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ELECTRONIC ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY (see attached). (See Dkt. # 137). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/28/2017.(Watson, M.)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Ruling, Defendant's Motion 32 to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/18/17. (Denker, J.)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ELECTRONIC ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY (see attached) Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/5/2017.(Watson, M.)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ELECTRONIC ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/24/2017. (Watson, M.)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Ruling, Plaintiff's Motion 11 for a Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED in part. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/3/16. (Denker, J.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InteliClear, LLC v. Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InteliClear, LLC
Represented By: Adam B. Marks
Represented By: Richard S. Order
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Victor
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Tinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?