Green v. Shaw et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Defendant: Shaw and Auguste
Case Number: 3:2017cv00913
Filed: June 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Tolland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Haight
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RULING (see attached) granting Defendants' 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Defendants and close this case. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 3/29/2019. (Ghosh, R.)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULING (attached). For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy and 14 Motion to Disclose Property are DENIED. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 10/18/2017. (Kaczmarek, S.)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER (see attached). Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on August 17, 2017.(Kahl, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Shaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auguste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?