US Bank Trust, N.A. v. Walbert

Plaintiff: US Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Andrew Walbert
Case Number: 3:2017cv00991
Filed: June 16, 2017
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Haight
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING (attached) denying Defendant's 21 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 11/7/2017. (Kaczmarek, S.)
October 16, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING (attached) on Plaintiff's Declaration of Attorney's Fees and Costs. For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, the Court finds that Plaintiff is entitled to $6,398 in attorney's fees. Defendant is ordered to transmit that amount to Plaintiff on or before November 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 10/16/2017. (Kaczmarek, S.)
August 18, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING (see attached). For the reasons stated in the attached Ruling, Plaintiff's 9 Motion to Remand to State Court is GRANTED. The parties shall make submissions with respect to costs and attorneys' fees as directed. The Court sha ll retain jurisdiction over the parties solely for the purpose of setting the amount of costs and attorneys' fees if submitted by Plaintiff. This case shall be remanded forthwith to the Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of Danbury. T he Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case, without prejudice to reopening if Plaintiff submits an application for attorneys' fees and costs in proper form by September 5, 2017. Defendant shall have until September 15, 2017 to respond to any such application. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on August 18, 2017. (Kahl, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Bank Trust, N.A. v. Walbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: David M. Bizar
Represented By: Amy L. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Walbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?