Abrams v. Waters et al

Plaintiff: David A. Abrams
Defendant: Waters, Nunez, Phillips, Kelly, John Watson, Scott Erfe, John Doe and Ramirez
Case Number: 3:2017cv01659
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Haight
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING (see attached) granting Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Leave to File An Amended Complaint, pursuant to Rule 15(a), Fed. R. Civ. P., but striking certain specified claims from Plaintiff's 18 Amended Complaint for failing to state claims upon which relief may be granted, 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. (See contents of Ruling as to stricken claims.) Upon entry of this Ruling, the Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's 18 Amended Complaint as a separate en try on the case docket. Defendants must thereafter answer or respond to the Amended Complaint (i.e., those claims the Court has ruled may proceed) on or before July 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 8, 2018.(Dorais, L.)
March 26, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING (see attached) denying 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 26, 2018. (Dorais, L.)
February 2, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL REVIEW ORDER (see attached). Upon the Court's review of Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 28 US.C. § 1915A, the case may proceed only on the following federal claims: Eighth Amendment claim for "excessive force" again st Phillips, Eighth Amendment claim for "failure to protect" from harm against Nunez, and Eighth Amendment hazardous "conditions of confinement" claim against Watson. Each federal claim is permitted against the defendant solely in his individual capacity for money damages. Abrams's state law claims of assault, battery, and intentional infliction of emotional distress may proceed against Phillips in his individual capacity for damages. All other state law claims and all requests for declaratory relief are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on February 2, 2018. (Dorais, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. Waters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Erfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?