Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD. v. Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America

Plaintiff: Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America
Case Number: 3:2017cv01673
Filed: October 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER CORRECTING AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 41 : Rather than jury selection dates set in the previous order, the Court sets times for a bench trial. All other dates remain the same. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 3/8/2019. Dispositive motions are due by 4/12/2019. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 5/3/2019, and a bench trial will take place in the month of June 2019 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 1/10/2020, and and a bench trial will take place in the month of February 2020 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month that the bench trial is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #5 --including the deadlines and format of filings--when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than two weeks before the month of trial. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/27/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the following amended case management deadlines in light of the parties' upcoming mediation and proposed schedule, Dkt. #40 . All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 3/8/2019. Dispositive motions are due by 4/12/2019. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 5/3/2019, and jury selection will take place on 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 1/10/2020, and jury selection will take place on 2/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month after jury selection is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #11 -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the voir dire questions, jury instructions, and motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 2 weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/27/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
November 20, 2018 Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER to Revise Schedule filed jointly on behalf of all parties by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #38 Motion to Stay. The parties are directed to file a joint proposed revised scheduling order taking into account the impact of the upcoming mediation session by 11/21/2018 for the Court's consideration. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/14/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
November 13, 2018 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Mediation by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD..Responses due by 12/4/2018 (Milas, Jane)
August 30, 2018 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Discovery status teleconference held on 8/30/2018. Total Time: 4 minutes. (Court Reporter F. Velez, ECRO.) (Shafer, J.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 08/15/2018. The discovery status teleconference is now set for 8/30/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
July 6, 2018 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America.(Cohane, Jared)
July 6, 2018 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America. (Cohane, Jared)
June 13, 2018 Filing 33 Docket Entry Correction re #32 Order on Motion to Dismiss to correct clerical error. (Shafer, J.)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Dismiss/Stay the Complaint and to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/12/2018. (Shafer, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2018: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Shafer, J.).
December 19, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic status conference set for 8/15/2018 at 04:30 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: After considering the parties' #29 Rule 26(f) Report, the Court sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 08/15/2018 at 4:30 PM. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 11/16/2018. Dispositive motions are due by 12/14/2018. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 01/14/2019, and a bench trial will take place in the month of March 2019 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 08/14/2019, and a bench trial will take place in the month of October 2019 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Dates for the presentation of evidence will be designated following the submission of the JTM. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month of the Bench Trial. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket. Counsel are directed to read and comply with all provisions of Chambers Practices #7 --in particular, this Chambers' font formatting standards. The Court will summarily reject future, noncompliant filings. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/18/2017. (Lee, E.)
December 15, 2017 Filing 29 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Milas, Jane)
December 15, 2017 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Reply to Objection to Motion to Dismiss/Stay the Complaint of Lesico and to Compel Arbitration filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America. (Cohane, Jared)
December 1, 2017 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss /Stay the Complaint of Lesico filed by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
December 1, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Ruggieri on behalf of Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD. (Ruggieri, Robert)
December 1, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Payne on behalf of Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD. (Payne, Michael)
November 16, 2017 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael H. Payne to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4593552) by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
November 16, 2017 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert G. Ruggieri to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4593644) by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Attorney Robert G. Ruggieri to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/15/2018. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2017. (Bozek, M.)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Attorney Michael H. Payne to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/15/2018. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2017. (Bozek, M.)
November 16, 2017 Reset deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss/Stay the Complaint of Lesico. Response now due by 12/1/2017 per 20 Order. (Shafer, J.)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #12 Motion to Dismiss for good cause shown. Plaintiff's response is due on or before 12/01/2017. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/15/2017. (Lee, E.)
November 14, 2017 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/1/2017 respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
November 14, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert G. Ruggieri to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4604882) by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
November 14, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael H. Payne to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4604862) by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #14 Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; denying without prejudice to refiling #15 Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Petitioners fail to satisfy the requirement under D. Conn. Local Rule 83.1(b)(vi) that they have "no pending disciplinary complaint(s) as to which a finding has been made that such complaint(s) should proceed to a hearing." Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/07/2017. (Lee, E.)
November 3, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert G. Ruggieri to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4593644) by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
November 3, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael H. Payne to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4593552) by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
November 1, 2017 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss /Stay the Complaint of Lesico filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration)(Cohane, Jared)
November 1, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss /Stay the Complaint of Lesico by Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America.Responses due by 11/22/2017 (Cohane, Jared)
November 1, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Cohane on behalf of Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America (Cohane, Jared)
October 25, 2017 Filing 10 First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America served on 10/13/2017, answer due 11/3/2017. (Milas, Jane)
October 5, 2017 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jane I. Milas* *Garcia & Milas* *44 Trumbull St.* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Shafer, J.)
October 5, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Notice of Appearance, and #1 Complaint filed by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD. Signed by Clerk on 10/05/2017. (Shafer, J.)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/04/2017. (Shafer, J.)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/04/2017. (Shafer, J.)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/04/2017. (Shafer, J.)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 01/04/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2017. Discovery due by 4/5/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/5/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/04/2017. (Shafer, J.)
October 4, 2017 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 4, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.. (Milas, Jane)
October 4, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane I. Milas on behalf of Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD. (Milas, Jane)
October 4, 2017 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Milas, Jane)
October 4, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4557325.), filed by Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD..(Milas, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD. v. Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesico Initiation and Civil Engineering, LTD.
Represented By: Jane I. Milas
Represented By: Michael H. Payne
Represented By: Robert G. Ruggieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America
Represented By: Jared Cohane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?