Neufeld v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki, Troy Terry, Nicholas Marshall, Nathan Wheatley, William Ninivaggi, Kevin Jacques, Joyce Wood, Timothy Ruthersby and Robert Burns
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company and CareCentrix, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01693
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Kari A Dooley
2 Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #136 MOTION for Attorney(s) Charlotte Loper to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6030891) by Robert Burns, Kevin Jacques, Nicholas Marshall, Jeffrey Neufeld, William Ninivaggi, Timothy Ruthersby, Aubrey Srednicki, Troy Terry, Nathan Wheatley, Joyce Wood. (Loper, Charlotte)
August 14, 2020 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Eleanor Loper on behalf of Robert Burns, Kevin Jacques, Nicholas Marshall, Jeffrey Neufeld, William Ninivaggi, Timothy Ruthersby, Aubrey Srednicki, Troy Terry, Nathan Wheatley, Joyce Wood (Loper, Charlotte)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charlotte Loper, Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 136 MOTION for Attorney(s) Charlotte Loper to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6030891) by Robert Burns, Kevin Jacques, Nicholas Marshall, Jeffrey Neufeld, William Ninivaggi, Timothy Ruthersby, Aubrey Srednicki, Troy Terry, Nathan Wheatley, Joyce Wood. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Narwold, William)
July 22, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 8077899. (D'Amato, Joseph)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting on consent #133 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on November 23, 2020 at 11:30 AM. The Scheduling Order is modified as follows:Claims sampling lists exchanged on or before August 9, 2020All requests for admission must be served on or before November 23, 2020Service of 30(b)(6) deposition notices for class certification topics on or before September 11, 2020Completion of 30(b)(6) depositions for class certification topics on or before November 13, 2020Motion for class certification with any expert reports due on or before November 17, 2020Close of all non-deposition fact discovery (including production of documents in response to subpoenas) is January 25, 2021Opposition to class certification with any expert reports due on or before January 26, 2021Reply in support of motion for class certification due on or before February 26, 2021Service of 30(b)(6) deposition notices for merits topics on or before March 1, 2021Expert reports where party bears burden of proof due on or before March 11, 2021Rebuttal expert reports due on or before April 30, 2021All depositions completed including 30(b)(6) depositions for merits topics on or before June 16, 2021 Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/22/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Filing 133 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until (see enclosed schedule) 129 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, #127 Stipulation by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren)
March 31, 2020 Filing 132 ANSWER to #130 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses. To Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company.(Sconzo, James)
March 16, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company of Change of Firm and Address (Sconzo, James)
March 10, 2020 Filing 130 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT) against Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, filed by Nathan Wheatley, Jeffrey Neufeld, Troy Terry, William Ninivaggi, Nicholas Marshall, Kevin Jacques, Aubrey Srednicki, Joyce Wood, Robert Burns, Timothy Ruthersby.(Izard, Robert)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order granting on consent Plaintiffs' #128 Motion for leave to file fourth amended complaint and to join additional parties subject to the conditions provided for in the parties' #127 joint stipulation, which is SO ORDERED. Pursuant to the parties' #127 joint stipulation the Scheduling Order is modified as follows:Completion of party document production due on or before 5/11/2020Disclosure of party privilege logs due on or before 6/9/2020All requests for admission must be served on or before 7/13/2020Motion for class certification with any expert reports due on or before 9/14/2020Close of fact discovery (including production of documents in response to subpoenas) is 10/12/2020Opposition to class certification with any expert reports due on or before 11/16/2020Reply in support of motion for class certification due on or before 12/14/2020Expert reports where party bears burden of proof due on or before 1/11/2021Rebuttal expert reports due on or before 3/1/2021Depositions completed on or before 4/16/2021 Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/9/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
March 6, 2020 Filing 128 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #113 Amended Complaint [CONSENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JOIN ADDITIONAL PLAINTFFS] by Kevin Jacques, Nicholas Marshall, Jeffrey Neufeld, William Ninivaggi, Aubrey Srednicki, Troy Terry, Nathan Wheatley.Responses due by 3/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Redline comparing Fourth Amended Complaint with operative Third Amended Complaint)(Izard, Robert)
March 6, 2020 Filing 127 Joint STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SCHEDULE by Kevin Jacques, Nicholas Marshall, Jeffrey Neufeld, William Ninivaggi, Aubrey Srednicki, Troy Terry, Nathan Wheatley. (Izard, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATED ORDER granting #125 Motion for Entry of Revised Amended Claim Sampling Protocol. See attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/3/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
January 3, 2020 Filing 125 Joint MOTION for Entry of Revised Amended Claim Sampling Protocol by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren)
January 2, 2020 Filing 124 Joint MOTION for Entry of Amended Claim Sampling Protocol by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren) Modified on 1/3/2020 (Gould, K.).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATED ORDER granting #122 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/7/2019. (D'Amato, Joseph)
November 6, 2019 Filing 122 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until (see enclosed schedule) Discovery Schedule 108 Order on Motion for Order,, by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019.(Hushin, Z.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 120 ANSWER to #113 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company.(Haskel, Warren)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #117 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Terence Y. Leong. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #116 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carrie J. Bodner. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION for Attorney(s) Terence Y. Leong to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5412706) by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sconzo, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carrie J. Bodner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sconzo, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carrie J. Bodner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5412642) by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Sconzo, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 114 Amended RICO Case Statement by Kevin Jacques, Nicholas Marshall, Jeffrey Neufeld, William Ninivaggi, Aubrey Srednicki, Troy Terry, Nathan Wheatley. (Izard, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 113 AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) against Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki, Kevin Jacques, Troy Terry, Nathan Wheatley, Nicholas Marshall, William Ninivaggi.(Izard, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER approving #110 Stipulation filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. The Proposed Third Amended Complaint will be the operative complaint in this action and shall be posted to the docket as a stand alone entry; Plaintiffs will file an amended RICO case statement on or before August 7, 2019; and Cigna's response to the Proposed Third Amended Complaint will be due August 27, 2019. So ordered. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/6/19.(Ladd-Smith, I.)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Joinder; granting #109 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/6/19. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 110 Joint STIPULATION re #109 MOTION for Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs MOTION to Amend/Correct by filing the [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint (and Proposed Order) by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren)
July 15, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION for Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs, MOTION to Amend/Correct by filing the [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint (Responses due by 8/5/2019, ) by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Ex. A: Proposed Third Amended Complaint (CLEAN), #3 Ex. B: Proposed Third Amended Complaint (REDLINE))(Izard, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Motion for Order. The (i) Amended Stipulation and Order Regarding the Collection and Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information; (ii) Stipulation and Order Regarding Claim Sampling Protocol; and (iii) Stipulation and Scheduling Order are approved and so ordered. Fact discovery is due April 10, 2020. Motion for class certification is due March 13, 2020; response and reply are due May 15, 2020, and June 12, 2020, respectively. Dispositive motions are due 45 days after class certification decision. All other proposed deadlines are approved and adopted. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/17/19. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 107 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Claim Sampling Stipulation, ESI Stipulation, and Proposed Scheduling Order by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Claim Sampling Protocol, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re ESI, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Haskel, Warren)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Protective Order. So ordered. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/4/19. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 105 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki.Responses due by 4/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed First Amended Protective Order)(Izard, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #103 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/1/2019. (LaMura, K.)
February 26, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION to Withdraw by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company Withdrawal of Counsel (Valerio, Michael) Modified on 2/28/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
October 24, 2018 Filing 102 Joint STIPULATION excluding certain claims from the Classes by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Filing 101 ANSWER to #98 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company.(Haskel, Warren)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER finding as moot #88 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/1/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
September 24, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki re #88 MOTION to Compel (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL) (Izard, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Filing 98 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) (amended pursuant to the Court's August 30, 2018 Order) against Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki.(Izard, Robert)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #55 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/30/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 96 RESPONSE re #95 Notice of Additional Authority by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren)
August 20, 2018 Filing 95 Notice of Additional Authority re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: DAddario v. DAddario)(Izard, Robert)
July 31, 2018 Filing 94 RESPONSE re #93 Notice of Additional Authority, filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren)
July 25, 2018 Filing 93 Notice of Additional Authority re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #88 MOTION to Compel filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Langan v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.)(Narwold, William)
July 19, 2018 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to #88 MOTION to Compel filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
July 13, 2018 Filing 91 RESPONSE re #89 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren)
July 5, 2018 Filing 90 Memorandum in Opposition re #88 MOTION to Compel filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Warren Haskel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Declaration of Shannon Bartlett)(Haskel, Warren)
June 19, 2018 Filing 89 REPLY to Response to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [SUR-REPLY concerning remaining issues] filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
June 13, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION to Compel by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki.Responses due by 7/4/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration and Local Civil Rule 37(a) Certification of Craig A. Raabe, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Craig A. Raabe)(Raabe, Craig)
June 6, 2018 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Addressing Remaining Arguments Concerning Counts II-IV, VIII, X, and XII filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Warren Haskel, #2 Exhibit A)(Haskel, Warren)
May 31, 2018 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #79 MOTION for Attorney(s) Meghan S. B. Oliver to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4830784) by Jeffrey Neufeld. (Oliver, Meghan)
May 31, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Oliver on behalf of Jeffrey Neufeld (Oliver, Meghan)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Protective Order. So ordered. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/18/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Order. So ordered. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/18/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
May 16, 2018 Filing 82 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki.Responses due by 6/6/2018 (Izard, Robert)
May 16, 2018 Filing 81 Joint MOTION for Order Regarding the Collection and Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information Order by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Meghan S.B. Oliver. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/15/2018. Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION for Attorney(s) Meghan S. B. Oliver to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4830784) by Jeffrey Neufeld. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Meghan S. B. Oliver)(Narwold, William)
May 9, 2018 Filing 78 Second Memorandum in Opposition [Addressing Remaining Arguments in Parts III and V Concerning Counts II-IV, VIII, X, and XII] re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Raabe, Craig)
April 16, 2018 Filing 77 Memorandum in Opposition (SUR-REPLY) re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
April 9, 2018 Filing 76 RESPONSE re #74 MOTION for briefing schedule relating to remaining issues re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Motion for extension of time. Plaintiffs' opposition is due May 9, 2018. Cigna's reply is due June 6, 2018. Page limits are extended as requested. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/6/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
April 2, 2018 Filing 74 MOTION for briefing schedule relating to remaining issues re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company.Responses due by 4/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain between Cigna's and Plaintiffs' Counsel)(Haskel, Warren)
April 2, 2018 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/21/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
March 20, 2018 Reset Deadline as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Responses due by 4/2/2018 (Gould, K.)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER finding as moot #54 Motion to Dismiss in light of #63 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of CareCentrix, Inc. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/20/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #69 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/20/2018. (LaMura, K.)
March 16, 2018 Filing 69 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2018 to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Haskel, Warren)
March 7, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth R. Klein on behalf of Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki (Klein, Seth)
March 6, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Seal [ECF 66] Sealed / Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Cigna's Motion to Dismiss by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
March 6, 2018 Filing 66 Sealed Document: Unredacted / Sealed Version of [ECF 64] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Cigna's Motion to Dismiss [ECF 55] by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki re #64 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Izard, Robert)
March 6, 2018 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT re #64 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Robert A. Izard Signed By Robert A. Izard filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Izard, Robert)
March 6, 2018 Filing 64 Memorandum in Opposition (Redacted / Public Version) re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
February 28, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of CareCentrix, Inc. (without prejudice) by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki (Izard, Robert)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re #48 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. A telephonic scheduling conference is set for February 1, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Please dial 888 636 3807 to connect; Enter 6614539 followed by pound (#) to join. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/26/18.(Ladd-Smith, I.)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/26/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
January 23, 2018 Filing 60 Sealed Document: Exhibit C - CareCentrix Provider Agreement by CareCentrix, Inc. re #57 MOTION to Seal Portion of Ex. B Managed Care Alliance Agreement and Portions of Ex. C CareCentrix Provider Agreement . (Rollins, James)
January 23, 2018 Filing 59 Sealed Document: Exhibit B Managed Care Alliance Agreement by CareCentrix, Inc. re #57 MOTION to Seal Portion of Ex. B Managed Care Alliance Agreement and Portions of Ex. C CareCentrix Provider Agreement . (Rollins, James)
January 23, 2018 Filing 58 Memorandum in Support re #57 MOTION to Seal Portion of Ex. B Managed Care Alliance Agreement and Portions of Ex. C CareCentrix Provider Agreement filed by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
January 23, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION to Seal Portion of Ex. B Managed Care Alliance Agreement and Portions of Ex. C CareCentrix Provider Agreement by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
January 23, 2018 Filing 56 Memorandum in Support re #54 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Rollins, James)
January 23, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company.Responses due by 2/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Warren Haskel in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Warren Haskel, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Warren Haskel, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Warren Haskel, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Warren Haskel)(Haskel, Warren)
January 23, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss by CareCentrix, Inc..Responses due by 2/13/2018 (Rollins, James)
January 23, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren Haskel on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Haskel, Warren)
January 23, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B. Simon on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Simon, Joshua)
January 19, 2018 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #34 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lane W. Davis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651750) by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
January 19, 2018 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #32 MOTION for Attorney(s) Raymond G. Mullady, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651663) by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
January 19, 2018 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #33 MOTION for Attorney(s) William S. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651719) by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
January 19, 2018 Filing 48 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Izard, Robert)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/18/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
January 16, 2018 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss and Opposition Briefing by CareCentrix, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Rollins, James)
January 16, 2018 Reset Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/19/2018 (Gould, K.)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/16/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
January 12, 2018 Filing 44 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 19, 2018 to file the parties' Rule 26(f) report by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
January 9, 2018 Filing 43 RICO Case Statement by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki. (Izard, Robert)
January 9, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond G. Mullady, Jr on behalf of CareCentrix, Inc. (Mullady, Raymond)
January 8, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Lane Whittaker Davis on behalf of CareCentrix, Inc. (Davis, Lane)
January 8, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Brown on behalf of CareCentrix, Inc. (Brown, William)
December 27, 2017 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/12/2018 (LaMura, K.)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/27/2017. (LaMura, K.)
December 21, 2017 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until January 12, 2018 to File Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Valerio, Michael)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/18/2018. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2017. (Gould, K.)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/18/2018. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2017. (Gould, K.)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/18/2018. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2017. (Gould, K.)
December 19, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lane W. Davis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651750) by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
December 19, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION for Attorney(s) William S. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651719) by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
December 19, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney(s) Raymond G. Mullady, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4651663) by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
December 14, 2017 Answer deadline updated for CareCentrix, Inc. to 1/23/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are due January 23, 2018;Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions is due March 6, 2018;Defendants' Replies to Plaintiffs' Oppositions are due March 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/13/17. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
December 13, 2017 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 23, 2018and for Entry of Agreed Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Rico Statement and Defendants' Anticipated Motions to Dismiss to respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #29 Amended Complaint by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
December 11, 2017 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CareCentrix, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Aubrey Srednicki.(Izard, Robert)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joshua B. Simon for Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company added.. Signed by Clerk on 11/29/2017. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 11/29/2017 to edit text (Fazekas, J.).
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Warren Haskel for Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company added.. Signed by Clerk on 11/29/2017. (Fazekas, J.)
November 28, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua Simon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4618062) by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joshua Simon, #2 Exhibit Joshua Simon)(Valerio, Michael)
November 28, 2017 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Warren Haskel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4617944) This replaces Doc. 24-1 (wrong Affidavit filed with Haskel Pro Hac Vice) filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Valerio, Michael)
November 28, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Warren Haskel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4617944) by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Warren Haskel, #2 Exhibit Warren Haskel)(Valerio, Michael)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' motions to dismiss are due January 8, 2018. Plaintiff's opposition is due February 22, 2018. Defendants' replies are due March 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/8/17. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
November 7, 2017 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Sconzo, James)
November 7, 2017 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 8, 2018 to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and for Entry of Agreed Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Anticipated Motions to Dismiss by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Sconzo, James)
November 7, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Valerio on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Valerio, Michael)
November 7, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Sconzo on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Sconzo, James)
November 6, 2017 Answer deadline updated for CareCentrix, Inc. to 12/7/2017. (Gould, K.)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/6/17. (Gould, K.)
November 3, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/07/2017Carecentrix, Inc.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint Answer Complaint by CareCentrix, Inc.. (Rollins, James)
November 3, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James Scott Rollins on behalf of CareCentrix, Inc. (Rollins, James)
October 18, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Neufeld. CareCentrix, Inc. served on 10/17/2017, answer due 11/7/2017; Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company served on 10/17/2017, answer due 11/7/2017. (Izard, Robert)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Warren W. Eginton for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/10/2017. (Shafer, J.)
October 10, 2017 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *CareCentrix, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert A. Izard, Jr.* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe, LLP-CT* *29 South Main St., Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Bozek, M.)
October 10, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #10 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Complaint filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, #4 Notice of Related Case filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, Request to Issue Summons, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, #9 Standing Protective Order, #11 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey Neufeld, and #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey Neufeld. Signed by Clerk on 10/10/2017.(Bozek, M.)
October 10, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew P. Jasinski on behalf of Jeffrey Neufeld (Jasinski, Mathew)
October 10, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Narwold on behalf of Jeffrey Neufeld (Narwold, William)
October 6, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Identification of Initial Discovery Protocol for Employment Cases)(Bozek, M.)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/6/2017.(Bozek, M.)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/6/2017.(Bozek, M.)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/6/2017.(Bozek, M.)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/6/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2017. Discovery due by 4/7/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/7/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/2017.(Bozek, M.)
October 6, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case by Jeffrey Neufeld (Izard, Robert)
October 6, 2017 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 6, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Barrett on behalf of Jeffrey Neufeld (Barrett, Christopher)
October 6, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Raabe on behalf of Jeffrey Neufeld (Raabe, Craig)
October 6, 2017 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to CareCentrix, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Izard, Robert)
October 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CareCentrix, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4560428.), filed by Jeffrey Neufeld. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Izard, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neufeld v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James M. Sconzo
Represented By: Michael A. Valerio
Represented By: Joshua B. Simon
Represented By: Warren Haskel
Represented By: James Scott Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareCentrix, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond G. Mullady, Jr
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Represented By: James Scott Rollins
Represented By: William S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Neufeld
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Represented By: Seth R. Klein
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Meghan Oliver
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Srednicki
Represented By: Seth R. Klein
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Terry
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Marshall
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Wheatley
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ninivaggi
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Jacques
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Wood
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ruthersby
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Burns
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Charlotte Eleanor Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?