Riddick v. Semple et al

Plaintiff: Jerome Riddick
Defendant: Scott Semple, Angel Quiros, Nicole Prior, Gregorio Robles, Caron and Scanning Program - Northern
Case Number: 3:2018cv00408
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Stefan R. Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 18 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 20 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/18/18. (Kaas, E.)
June 7, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice to filing an amended complaint within 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/7/18. (Kaas, E.)
May 25, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Disqualify Judge for Personal Bias or Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/25/18. (Kaas, E.)
April 18, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding future filings. To the extent Riddick wishes to request court action in future filings, he is hereby ORDERED to label such filings as motions, not as proposed orders. To the extent Riddick wishes to file the same document in multiple cases, he is hereby ORDERED to file separate documents in each case, each such document bearing only the caption of that case. Riddick is directed to consult the entire order attached to this docket entry for more details. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/18/2018. (Schneider, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riddick v. Semple et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Riddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Semple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Prior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregorio Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scanning Program - Northern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?