Amaty v. International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group et al
Plaintiff: Robert Amaty
Defendant: International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group and Buchanan Marine, LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv00741
Filed: May 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2019 (Ferguson, L.)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions (ECF No. #26 ) is hereby GRANTED up to and including April 12, 2019. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/7/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until April 12, 2019 to file Dispositive Motions Set Deadlines/Hearings by International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group. (Murray, Henry)
December 12, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 2/21/2019 at 01:00 PM in Chambers Room 258, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Landsman, Halle)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 2/21/2019 at 1:00 PM with Judge Richardson. Please see attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 12/12/18. (Landsman, Halle)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for a settlement conference. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/4/2018. (Jerjian, O.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Joint Status Report (ECF No. #21 ) is hereby APPROVED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/4/2018. (Jerjian, O.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by Robert Amaty. (Pantuso, Anthony)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE STATUS REPORT: As set forth in the attached document, the parties shall file a joint status report by December 3, 2018. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/24/2018. (Ly, T.)
August 24, 2018 Set Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2018 (Ferguson, L.)
August 23, 2018 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 12/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2019. (Ferguson, L.)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (Doc. No. #14 ) is hereby APPROVED. All discovery shall be completed by December 15, 2018. Dispositive motions shall be filed by February 3, 2019. All other dates requested in this report are also approved. The court will issue a trial memorandum order once the dispositive motions deadline has passed. REMINDER: please refer to the electronic filing order in civil cases re the requirements for submission of chambers copies. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/23/2018. (Ly, T.)
August 23, 2018 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin W. Thompson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/23/2018. Total time: 3 minutes. (Court Reporter Thompson C.) (Ly, T.)
August 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/23/2018 03:30 PM before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. Instructions for dialing in to the chambers conference line have been emailed to the parties. (Ly, T.)
June 22, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Buchanan Marine, LP.(Cohen, Craig)
June 22, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group.(Murray, Henry)
June 13, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pantuso, Anthony)
June 4, 2018 Answer deadline updated for International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group to 6/22/2018. (Ferguson, L.)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. #12 ) for defendant International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Doc. No. #1 ) is hereby GRANTED up to and including June 22, 2018, absent objection. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/4/2018. (Ly, T.)
May 31, 2018 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 22, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint by International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group. (Murray, Henry)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Stipulation for Extension of Time (Doc. No. #8 ) for defendant Buchanan Marine LP to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Doc. No. #1 ) is hereby GRANTED up to and including June 22, 2018. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/30/2018. (Ly, T.)
May 29, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry F. Murray on behalf of International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group (Murray, Henry)
May 25, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Amaty. Buchanan Marine, LP served on 5/11/2018, answer due 6/1/2018; International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group served on 5/21/2018, answer due 6/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement supplemental return)(Pantuso, Anthony)
May 23, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to answer or respond to complaint by Buchanan Marine, LP. (Cohen, Craig)
May 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig L. Cohen on behalf of Buchanan Marine, LP (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Cohen, Craig)
May 2, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Buchanan Marine, LP, International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *Law Offices of Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *58 River Street* *Milford, CT 06460*. (Enderlin, M.)
May 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Robert Amaty Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/2/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/2/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/2/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2018 Discovery due by 11/1/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2018 Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
May 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4815949.), filed by Robert Amaty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pantuso, Anthony) Modified on 5/2/2018 (Walker, A).
May 2, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Pantuso, Anthony)
May 2, 2018 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amaty v. International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO, Atlantic Marine Group
Represented By: Henry F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buchanan Marine, LP
Represented By: Craig L. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Amaty
Represented By: Anthony J. Pantuso, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?