Palmenta v. Blank et al

Plaintiff: Scott Palmenta
Defendant: Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Kevin Moynihan and Peter Condos
Case Number: 3:2018cv01078
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2018 29 OBJECTION re #25 MOTION for Permission to Order Defendants to Answer Discovery Request filed by Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan. (Zellner, Jonathan)
August 10, 2018 28 OBJECTION re #17 MOTION to freeze any and all assets filed by Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan. (Zellner, Jonathan)
August 8, 2018 27 RESPONSE re #23 Response filed by Scott Palmenta. (Oliver, T.)
August 8, 2018 26 NOTICE to the Court by Scott Palmenta (Oliver, T.)
August 3, 2018 25 MOTION for Permission to Order Defendants to Answer Discovery Request by Scott Palmenta. Responses due by 8/24/2018 (Oliver, T.)
August 3, 2018 24 MOTION to Clarify by Scott Palmenta. (Oliver, T.)
August 3, 2018 23 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION on Appearance filed by Defendant's Attorney's filed by Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan. (Zellner, Jonathan)
July 30, 2018 22 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/5/2018. (Kaas, E.)
July 30, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/30/18. (Kaas, E.)
July 26, 2018 20 MOTION for Extension of Time until 90 days to respond to #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Scott Palmenta. (Gould, K.)
July 20, 2018 19 NOTICE to the Court by Scott Palmenta (Payton, R.)
July 20, 2018 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott Palmenta (Payton, R.)
July 20, 2018 17 MOTION to freeze any and all assets of defendant's by Scott Palmenta.Responses due by 8/10/2018 (Payton, R.)
July 20, 2018 16 MOTION on Appearance filed by Defendant's Attorney's by Scott Palmenta.Responses due by 8/10/2018 (Payton, R.)
July 17, 2018 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan.Responses due by 8/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss, #2 Appendix of Cases, #3 Exhibit Notice to Pro Se Litigant)(Zellner, Jonathan)
July 13, 2018 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott Palmenta (Payton, R.)
July 13, 2018 13 NOTICE to the Court by Scott Palmenta (Oliver, T.)
July 13, 2018 12 MOTION on Appearance filed by Defendant's Attorney's by Scott Palmenta. Responses due by 8/3/2018 (Oliver, T.)
June 26, 2018 11 Amended NOTICE by Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan STATEMENT RE: STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES (Zellner, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Kevin Moynihan, Matthew Blank, Ronald Bentley, Peter Condos, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan Zellner on behalf of Kevin Moynihan, Matthew Blank, Ronald Bentley, Peter Condos, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Statement Regarding Standing Order on Removed Cses filed by Kevin Moynihan, Matthew Blank, Ronald Bentley, Peter Condos, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in Stte Court filed by Kevin Moynihan, Matthew Blank, Ronald Bentley, Peter Condos, #9 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine S. Nietzel on behalf of Kevin Moynihan, Matthew Blank, Ronald Bentley, Peter Condos, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Kevin Moynihan, Matthew Blank, Ronald Bentley, Peter Condos, #8 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2018 9 Featured Case STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2018 8 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2018 7 Featured Case Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2018. Discovery due by 12/26/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2018 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 26, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine S. Nietzel on behalf of Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan (Nietzel, Catherine)
June 26, 2018 5 NOTICE by Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan OF PENDING MOTIONS (Zellner, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 4 NOTICE by Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan OF STATEMENT REGARDING STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES (Zellner, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 3 NOTICE by Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN STATE COURT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice of Removal State Court)(Zellner, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Zellner on behalf of Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Peter Condos, Kevin Moynihan (Zellner, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Peter Condos, Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Kevin Moynihan from Stamford Superior Court, case number FST-CV18-5019624-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4880592, filed by Peter Condos, Ronald Bentley, Matthew Blank, Kevin Moynihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Summons and Complaint)(Zellner, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmenta v. Blank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Bentley
Represented By: Catherine S. Nietzel
Represented By: Jonathan Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Blank
Represented By: Catherine S. Nietzel
Represented By: Jonathan Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Moynihan
Represented By: Catherine S. Nietzel
Represented By: Jonathan Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Condos
Represented By: Catherine S. Nietzel
Represented By: Jonathan Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Palmenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?