Perkins et al v. Halas et al

Plaintiff: Moore Bail Bonds, LLC and Yvonne Perkins
Defendant: Tony Maher, Roger Brooks, Melissa Morrill, Rachel Halas, Jim Antonelli and Joe LeRose
Case Number: 3:2018cv01081
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2018 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/1/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2019 (Gould, K.)
August 9, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER approving #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, ( Discovery due by 8/1/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2019) Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/9/2018.(LaMura, K.)
August 8, 2018 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John)
July 23, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Jim Antonelli to 8/27/2018; Roger Brooks to 8/27/2018; Rachel Halas to 8/27/2018; Joe LeRose to 8/27/2018; Tony Maher to 8/27/2018; Melissa Morrill to 8/27/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
July 20, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/20/2018. (LaMura, K.)
July 20, 2018 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until August 27, 2018 to plead or respond to plaintiffs' Complaint. by Jim Antonelli, Roger Brooks, Rachel Halas, Joe LeRose, Tony Maher, Melissa Morrill. (Casagrande, Daniel)
July 20, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Casagrande on behalf of Jim Antonelli, Roger Brooks, Rachel Halas, Joe LeRose, Tony Maher, Melissa Morrill (Casagrande, Daniel)
July 17, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yvonne Perkins, Moore Bail Bonds, LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Marshal Return)(Williams, John)
June 27, 2018 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jim Antonelli, Roger Brooks, Rachel Halas, Joe LeRose, Tony Maher, Melissa Morrill* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Gould, K.)
June 26, 2018 9 ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jim Antonelli, Roger Brooks, Rachel Halas, Joe LeRose, Tony Maher, Melissa Morrill* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510* (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 6/26/2018 (Fazekas, J.).
June 26, 2018 8 ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jim Antonelli, Roger Brooks, Rachel Halas, Joe LeRose, Tony Maher, Melissa Morrill* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510* (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 6/26/2018 (Fazekas, J.).
June 26, 2018 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Williams on behalf of Moore Bail Bonds, LLC, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Williams on behalf of Yvonne Perkins, #1 Complaint filed by Yvonne Perkins Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2018 6 Featured Case STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2018 5 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2018 4 Featured Case Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2018. Discovery due by 12/26/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2018 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
June 26, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Moore Bail Bonds, LLC (Williams, John)
June 26, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Yvonne Perkins (Williams, John)
June 26, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Williams, John)
June 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4881276.), filed by Yvonne Perkins.(Williams, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins et al v. Halas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Maher
Represented By: Daniel E. Casagrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Brooks
Represented By: Daniel E. Casagrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Morrill
Represented By: Daniel E. Casagrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Halas
Represented By: Daniel E. Casagrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Antonelli
Represented By: Daniel E. Casagrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe LeRose
Represented By: Daniel E. Casagrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moore Bail Bonds, LLC
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Perkins
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?