Able Home Healthcare, LLC v. Able, LLC

Plaintiff: Able Home Healthcare, LLC
Defendant: Able, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01159
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2018 32 Featured Case ORDER denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (without prejudice to re-filing) in light of the Parties' scheduled #29 Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/23/2018. (Mattessich, William)
August 10, 2018 CASE referred to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for Settlement Conference per Dkt. 28 Order. (Shafer, J.)
August 10, 2018 31 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION for Temporary Injunction filed by Able Home Healthcare, LLC. (Noonan, Robert)
August 10, 2018 30 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 9/26/2018 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 258, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Fries, J.)
August 10, 2018 29 Featured Case ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 9/26/18 at 1:00 PM with Judge Richardson. Please see attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 8/10/2018. (Fries, J.)
August 10, 2018 28 Featured Case ORDER of Referral for Settlement Conference. The Court has referred the parties for a settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson as #25 requested by the parties. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson's Chambers to schedule the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/10/2018. (Mattessich, William)
August 9, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER granting #25 Motion for Conference. The Court will refer this case to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for settlement as requested by the parties. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/9/2018. (Mattessich, William)
August 9, 2018 26 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Noonan, Robert)
August 8, 2018 25 Joint MOTION for Early Settlement Conference Conference by Able, LLC. (DeBlasiis, Brian)
August 8, 2018 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian DeBlasiis on behalf of Able, LLC (DeBlasiis, Brian)
July 31, 2018 23 Featured Case ORDER re #20 Notice of Appearance. The sponsoring attorney cannot enter an appearance for the visiting attorney. "Any counsel entering a case after the filing of the complaint, whether on behalf of a party or non-party, shall file with the Clerk and serve on all parties or their counsel a notice of appearance." D. Conn. Local Rule 5(b). Although Defendant's #16 Motion for Brian DeBlasiis to be admitted Pro Hac Vice was granted, attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must independently file appearances in order to address the court or file on the docket. Attorney DeBlasiis must enter his own appearance to represent Defendant in this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/31/2018. (Mattessich, William)
July 27, 2018 22 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Injunction filed by Able, LLC. (Iacurci, Michael)
July 27, 2018 21 OBJECTION to plaintiff's motion for temporary injunction filed by Able, LLC. (Iacurci, Michael)
July 25, 2018 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Iacurci on behalf of Able, LLC Appearance by Brian DeBlasiis (Iacurci, Michael)
July 20, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in light of 17 Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/20/2018. (Mattessich, William)
July 20, 2018 18 Featured Case ENTERED IN ERROR: ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in light of ECF No. 17. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/20/2018. (Rickevicius, L.) Modified on 7/20/2018 (Hernandez, T.).
July 20, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian DeBlasiis, Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Clerk on 07/20/2018. (Hernandez, T.)
July 19, 2018 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian DeBlasiis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Able, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Affidavit)(Iacurci, Michael)
July 16, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Noonan on behalf of Able Home Healthcare, LLC (Noonan, Robert)
July 16, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Padric F. S. Noonan on behalf of Able Home Healthcare, LLC (Noonan, Padric)
July 16, 2018 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian DeBlasiis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4901013) by Able, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Proposed Visiting Attorney)(Iacurci, Michael)
July 16, 2018 12 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachments) (Hernandez, T.)
July 16, 2018 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 MOTION for Temporary Injunction filed by Able Home Healthcare, LLC, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Able, LLC, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Able, LLC, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Able, LLC, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Able, LLC, #10 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Able, LLC, #9 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 07/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Hernandez, T.)
July 13, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
July 13, 2018 9 Featured Case STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
July 13, 2018 8 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
July 13, 2018 7 Featured Case Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/13/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2018. Discovery due by 1/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 07/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
July 13, 2018 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
July 13, 2018 6 MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Able Home Healthcare, LLC. Responses due by 8/3/2018. (Walker, A)
July 13, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Iacurci on behalf of ABLE, LLC (Iacurci, Michael)
July 13, 2018 4 NOTICE by ABLE, LLC Notice of Standing Orders for Removed Cases (Iacurci, Michael)
July 13, 2018 3 NOTICE by ABLE, LLC Petition for Removal (Iacurci, Michael)
July 13, 2018 2 NOTICE by ABLE, LLC Notice of Pending Motions (Iacurci, Michael)
July 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABLE, LLC from Judicial District of Fairfield, case number FBT-CV18-6075474-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4899923, filed by ABLE, LLC.(Iacurci, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Able Home Healthcare, LLC v. Able, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Able Home Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Padric F. S. Noonan
Represented By: Robert D. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Able, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Iacurci
Represented By: Brian DeBlasiis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?