Brown v. Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership

Plaintiff: Christopher E. Brown
Defendant: Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2018cv01160
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2018 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
August 31, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to the #14 Notice of Settlement without prejudice to either party moving to reopen the case to enforce the settlement. The Clerk's Office is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/31/2018. (Shafer, J.)
August 30, 2018 14 NOTICE of Settlement by Christopher E. Brown (Mussman, Louis)
August 13, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership to 8/30/2018 per Dkt. 13 Order. (Shafer, J.)
August 13, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for the Defendant to respond to the Complaint is now August 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/13/2018. (Lindberg, Christina)
August 10, 2018 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 30, 2018 to Respond to #1 Complaint by Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership. (Bieler, Philip)
August 10, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip H. Bieler on behalf of Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership (Bieler, Philip)
August 10, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher E. Brown. Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018. (Mussman, Louis)
August 8, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ioannis A. Kaloidis on behalf of Christopher E. Brown (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
July 16, 2018 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Louis I. Mussman* *Ku & Mussman,-FL* *18501 Pines Blvd.* *Pembroke Pines, FL 33029*. (Hernandez, T.)
July 16, 2018 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Louis I. Mussman* *Ku & Mussman,-FL* *18501 Pines Blvd.* *Pembroke Pines, FL 33029*. (Hernandez, T.)
July 16, 2018 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Christopher E. Brown, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices Signed by Clerk on 07/16/2018.(Hernandez, T.) Modified filed date on 7/17/2018 (Hernandez, T.).
July 13, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
July 13, 2018 4 Featured Case STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.) Modified filed date on 7/17/2018 (Hernandez, T.).
July 13, 2018 3 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
July 13, 2018 2 Featured Case Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/13/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2018. Discovery due by 1/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 07/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
July 13, 2018 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
July 13, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership. (Mussman, Louis)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4900075.), filed by Christopher E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Outlet Partners, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Philip H. Bieler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher E. Brown
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Ioannis A. Kaloidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?