In re: Cameron
Defendant: Cameron
Appellant: Norman George Cameron and George Cameron
Undetermined: US Trustee
Appellee: PHH Mortgage Corp
Case Number: 3:2018cv01165
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time of not less than 30 days to file Plaintiff's brief by George Cameron. (Pipech, L.)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel regarding briefing. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/13/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/13/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/13/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 18-20369, filed by George Cameron. (Attachments: #1 Order #40)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Norman George Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: George Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PHH Mortgage Corp
Represented By: Linda J. St. Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?