Rizvi et al v. BMW Financial Services NA, LLC
Plaintiff: Nusrat Rizvi and Eileen Rizvi
Defendant: BMW Financial Services NA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01175
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mocciolo, Adam)
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Protective Order, #5 Electronic Summons Issued, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Eileen Rizvi, Nusrat Rizvi Signed by Clerk on 7/18/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *BMW Financial Services NA, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Eileen Rizvi & Nusrat Rizvi* *1 Rowayton Court* *Norwalk, CT 06853*. (Fanelle, N.)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/17/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/17/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/17/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2018 Discovery due by 1/16/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2019 Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, filed by Eileen Rizvi, Nusrat Rizvi.(Fanelle, N.)
July 17, 2018 Filing fee received from Eileen Rizvi and Nusrat Rizvi: $ 400.00, receipt number CTXN00017436. (Fanelle, N.)
July 17, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rizvi et al v. BMW Financial Services NA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW Financial Services NA, LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Mocciolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nusrat Rizvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Rizvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?