Carroll v. Log Storm Security, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Carroll
Defendant: Dale Cline and Log Storm Security, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01191
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference is rescheduled to 9/24/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons (Esposito, A.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Telephone Call to Reschedule Settlement Conference held on 9/13/2018. 10 minutes. A separate calendar will enter. (Esposito, A.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. The Settlement Conference set for 9/13/18 is cancelled. The Court will hold a telephone call to reschedule the Settlement Conference on 9/13/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. The parties will call the conference line at the appointed time at: (877) 336-1828: Access Code: 33-444-88. (Esposito, A.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #29 Motion to Continue Settlement Conference or to Appear by Telephone at the September 13, 2018 Settlement Conference. The Motion to Continue is GRANTED. A telephone conference will be held on September 13, 2018, to reschedule the conference. A separate calendar will enter. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 9/11/18. (Esposito, A.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference or for Permission to Appear by Phone at the Settlement Conference on September 13, 2018 by Patrick M. Carroll. (Esposito, A.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Patrick M. Carroll by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc..(De Genaro, Paul)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Re: Settlement Conference on September 13, 2018. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED CONFERENCE ORDER. The parties may email their ex parte letters to the law clerk by September 7, 2018 at: Alyssa.esposito@ctd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 8/13/18.(Esposito, A.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 11:30 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. A separate Conference Order will enter. (Esposito, A.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Telephone Call to Schedule a Settlement Conference held on 8/13/2018. 20 minutes. (Esposito, A.)
August 2, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Settlement Conference set for 8/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons.This case has been referred to Judge Fitzsimmons for a settlement conference. She will hold a pre-conference telephone call with counsel on August 13, 2018 at 11:00 AM. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer, who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. The parties will call the Conference Line: (877) 336-1828; Access Code: 33-444-88 at the appointed time. (Esposito, A.)
July 30, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Dale Cline to 8/27/2018; Log Storm Security, Inc. to 8/27/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Response to Complaint due by 8/27/2018. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/27/2018. (Giammatteo, John)
July 27, 2018 Filing 22 Amended NOTICE by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc. re #21 Notice (Other) re Compliance With Standing Order on Removed Cases (De Genaro, Paul)
July 26, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc. re Compliance With Standing Order on Removed Cases (De Genaro, Paul)
July 26, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 27, 2018 to file responsive pleading in response to the plaintiff's complaint by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc.. (De Genaro, Paul)
July 26, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Csuka on behalf of Patrick M. Carroll (Csuka, Daniel)
July 26, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Alice Moore Leonhardt on behalf of Patrick M. Carroll (Leonhardt, Mary Alice)
July 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing re #10 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy set for 10/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden (Giammatteo, John)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/26/2018.(Giammatteo, John)
July 26, 2018 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/25/2018. Total Time: 0 hours and 15 minutes(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Giammatteo, John)
July 25, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 7/25/2018 at 03:00 Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/25/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Giammatteo, John)
July 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 7/25/2018 at 02:00 PM Status Conference set for 7/25/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Giammatteo, John)
July 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/25/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Giammatteo, John)
July 20, 2018 Filing 11 State MOTION for Disclosure of Assets by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc. (Fazekas, J.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 State MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy, State MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, State MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc. (Fazekas, J.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc. (re Pending Motions) (De Genaro, Paul)
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul A. De Genaro on behalf of Log Storm Security, Inc., Dale Cline, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Log Storm Security, Inc., Dale Cline, #4 Certificate of Service filed by Log Storm Security, Inc., Dale Cline, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Standing Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Log Storm Security, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 7/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/19/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2018. Discovery due by 1/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
July 19, 2018 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc. re #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (De Genaro, Paul)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Log Storm Security, Inc.. (De Genaro, Paul)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. De Genaro on behalf of Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc. (De Genaro, Paul)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court for the Judicial District of Stamford/Norwalk at Stamford, case number FST-CV-18-5019683-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4905540, filed by Dale Cline, Log Storm Security, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court pjr pleadings, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to plaintiff's complaint)(De Genaro, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Log Storm Security, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Carroll
Represented By: Mary Alice Moore Leonhardt
Represented By: Daniel James Csuka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cline
Represented By: Paul A. De Genaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Log Storm Security, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. De Genaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?