Khan v. BAB Developers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Khizar Khan
Defendant: Business Buidlouts.com, Nelson Berry, John Doe, BAB Developers, Inc. and Build a Business, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01268
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *BAB Developers, Inc., Nelson Berry, Build a Business, Inc., Business Buidlouts.com, John Doe* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert M. Berke* *Law Office of Robert M. Berke* *640 Clinton Avenue* *Bridgeport, CT 06605*. (Fazekas, J.)
August 2, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Berke, Robert)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Khizar Khan, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2018.(Gould, K.)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/31/2018.(Gould, K.)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/31/2018.(Gould, K.)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2018 Discovery due by 1/30/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/2019 Signed by Clerk on 7/31/2018.(Gould, K.)
July 31, 2018 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BCTDC-4919583.), filed by Khizar Khan.(Berke, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. BAB Developers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Buidlouts.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAB Developers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Build a Business, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khizar Khan
Represented By: Robert M. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?