Freundlich v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Marc Allen Freundlich
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01356
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariella Renee Zoltan on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Zoltan, Ariella)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A. Berryhill, Marc Allen Freundlich. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/14/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marc Allen Freundlich. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/14/2018, answer due 10/13/2018. Service made by Clerk via email. (Anastasio, F.)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Nancy A. Berryhill* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Ivan Michael Katz* *Law Offices of Ivan M. Katz* *57 Trumbull St., 3rd Fl.* *New Haven, CT 06510-1004*. (Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 Notice re: Statistical Information Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/13/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/13/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 Notice re: Consent to Magistrate Judge by Marc Allen Freundlich (Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Michael Katz on behalf of Marc Allen Freundlich (Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2018 Filing fee received from the Law Office of Ivan M. Katz: $ 400.00, receipt number CTXN00017583 (Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Marc Allen Freundlich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freundlich v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Ariella Renee Zoltan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Allen Freundlich
Represented By: Ivan Michael Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?