MidCap Funding Investment II LLC v. Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC
Plaintiff: MidCap Funding Investment II LLC
Defendant: Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01469
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Judgment. Judgment of Strict Foreclosure shall enter under a separate Docket Entry. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/28/18. (Dooley, Kari)
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment of Strict Foreclosure Upon Stipulation of Parties by MidCap Funding Investment II LLC.Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Stipulation for Judgment of Strict Foreclosure, #2 Schedule A - Affidavits of Appraisal, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavits of Appraisal - Notice of Appraisal Report Healthtrust, #4 Schedule B - Affidavit of Debt, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gugliotti, Thomas)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC, filed by MidCap Funding Investment II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description)(Gugliotti, Thomas)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend/Correct. The plaintiff is directed to Efile the Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/22/18. (Dooley, Kari)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by MidCap Funding Investment II LLC.Responses due by 11/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Red-lined Amended Complaint)(Gugliotti, Thomas)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W. Boatman on behalf of Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC (Boatman, Patrick)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 9/18/18.(Walker, J.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MidCap Funding Investment II LLC. Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (McEleney, Kevin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by MidCap Funding Investment II LLC (Attachments: #1 Marshal's Return of Service)(McEleney, Kevin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin Joseph McEleney* *Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, PC-Htfd* *100 Pearl St., 17th Floor, P.O. Box 231277* *Hartford, CT 06123-1277*. (Fazekas, J.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by MidCap Funding Investment II LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Joseph McEleney on behalf of MidCap Funding Investment II LLC, #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 8/30/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/30/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/30/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2018. Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Clerk on 8/30/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Joseph McEleney on behalf of MidCap Funding Investment II LLC (McEleney, Kevin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4952201.), filed by MidCap Funding Investment II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Gugliotti, Thomas)
August 30, 2018 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
August 30, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC. (McEleney, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MidCap Funding Investment II LLC v. Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MidCap Funding Investment II LLC
Represented By: Kevin Joseph McEleney
Represented By: Thomas A. Gugliotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Manchester Realty, LLC
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?