In re: Xiao
Defendant: Xiao
Appellant: Jie Xiao
Undetermined: US Trustee
Appellee: Ronald I. Chorches
Case Number: 3:2018cv01477
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Trial - Day 2. Held on 9/13/2017 before Judge James J Tancredi. Court Reporter: Suzanne Benoit. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Trial - Day 1. Held on 9/12/2017 before Judge James J Tancredi. Court Reporter: Suzanne Benoit. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Pretrial Conference. Held on 9/5/2017 before Judge James J Tancredi. Court Reporter: Suzanne Benoit. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Summary Judgment Hearing. Held on 4/10/2017 before Judge James J Tancredi. Court Reporter: Suzanne Benoit. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel/parties regarding briefing. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Fanelle, N.)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/31/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/31/2018.(Fanelle, N.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 13-51186, filed by Jie Xiao. (Attachments: #1 Order #557) (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Xiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jie Xiao
Represented By: Luis A. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ronald I. Chorches
Represented By: Ronald I. Chorches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?