Mihaley v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Mark Mihaley
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01491
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 10/18/2019, Post-discovery Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. Trial Brief due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/01/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 10/25/2018. (12 minutes. Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Ryan, Sarah)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Following a telephonic status conference with the parties, the Court adopts the following scheduling order: Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019, Discovery due by 10/18/2019, Post-discovery Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/24/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden, Joint Trial Memorandum due by 1/31/2020, et al., per attached Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/26/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. Lambert on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company (Lambert, Thomas)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kerianne Elizabeth Kane terminated from the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/24/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Kerianne Elizabeth Kane to Withdraw as Attorney by Metro-North Railroad Company. (Kane, Kerianne)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/25/2018 03:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/02/2018. (Ryan, Sarah)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Perry, Scott)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Metro-North Railroad Company waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018 filed by Mark Mihaley. (Perry, Scott)
September 19, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2018 (Perez, J.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O. Hickey on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company (Hickey, Robert)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerianne Elizabeth Kane on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company (Kane, Kerianne)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Beck S. Fineman on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company (Fineman, Beck)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Metro-North Railroad Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Scott E. Perry* *Cahill & Perry, P.C.* *43 Trumbull St.* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fazekas, J.)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Mark Mihaley, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/5/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/5/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2018. Discovery due by 3/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
September 5, 2018 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
September 5, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Metro-North Railroad Company. (Perry, Scott)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Railroad Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4957756.), filed by Mark Mihaley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mihaley v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Represented By: Robert O. Hickey
Represented By: Thomas S. Lambert
Represented By: Kerianne Elizabeth Kane
Represented By: Beck S. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mihaley
Represented By: Scott E. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?