Bolles et al v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brian J. Bolles and Darlene Russell
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01492
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Brian J. Bolles, Darlene Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply)(Britton, Lindsay)
October 29, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2019; Discovery due by 3/31/2020; Initial Status Report due by 11/23/2018; Pre-filing Conference Request Re: Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2020; Settlement Conference 4/2020; Trial Ready Date 10/5/2020; Trial Brief due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/27/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 23, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Blouin, Daniel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 22 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Britton, Lindsay)
October 12, 2018 Filing 21 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brian J. Bolles, Darlene Russell. (Britton, Lindsay)
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Brian J. Bolles, Darlene Russell. (Britton, Lindsay)
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Britton on behalf of Brian J. Bolles, Darlene Russell (Britton, Lindsay)
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.Responses due by 10/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Blouin, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion for Pre-filing Conference in light of ECF No. 16. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/18/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part #15 Motion for Pre-filing Conference. The pre-filing conference requirement is hereby waived. The defendant may file it's Motion to Dismiss without a pre-filing conference. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/17/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Prefiling Conference by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Schimelman, Benjamin)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Schimelman, Benjamin)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with the prefiling conference request requirement which states that no dispositive motion will be filed unless a prefiling conference is requested. Any request for a prefiling conference must be submitted in the form of a letter to the court (with copies to all counsel of record or pro se parties) briefly describing the nature and basis of the proposed motion. Except in cases involving pro se parties, no request for a prefiling conference may be submitted unless the attorney making the request has conferred with other counsel of record and discussed the proposed motion in a good faith effort to clarify the issues, eliminate or reduce the area of controversy and arrive at a mutually satisfactory resolution. Cf. D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 37(2)(requiring counsel to confer before filing motions relating to discovery disputes). Except in cases involving pro se parties, any request for a prefiling conference must include a statement that the attorney submitting the request has conferred with other counsel and must briefly describe the results of the conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/13/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.Responses due by 10/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Co. to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Blouin, Daniel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #10 Standing Protective Order, #2 Exhibit filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #9 Electronic Filing Order, and #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Standing Order)(Bozek, M.)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Isaac Schimelman on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company (Schimelman, Benjamin)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/5/2018.(Bozek, M.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/5/2018.(Bozek, M.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2018. Discovery due by 3/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2018.(Bozek, M.)
September 5, 2018 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company Statement of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Laurie, Robert)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company of Pending Motions (Laurie, Robert)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Laurie on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company (Laurie, Robert)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 EXHIBIT A by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Laurie, Robert)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company from Superior Court J.D. of Tolland at Rockville, case number TTD-CV18-6015624. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4957859, filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Laurie, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolles et al v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Bolles
Represented By: Jeffrey R Lindequist
Represented By: Lindsay Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Russell
Represented By: Jeffrey R Lindequist
Represented By: Lindsay Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Represented By: Daniel Michael Blouin
Represented By: Benjamin Isaac Schimelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?