Reidt v. Frontier Communications Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mary Reidt
Defendant: The Retirement Investment & Administration Committee, John/Jane Does 1-10, Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee, Jane Does and John Does
Case Number: 3:2018cv01538
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE re #29 MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference filed by Mary Reidt. (Izard, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Patrick Needham on behalf of Mary Reidt (Needham, Douglas)
November 2, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Kindall on behalf of Mary Reidt (Kindall, Mark)
October 26, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew A. Lyons-Berg to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997210) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Lyons-Berg, Andrew)
October 24, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian D. Netter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997208) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Netter, Brian)
October 19, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel D. Block to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997209) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Block, Samuel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Netter, Brian)
October 18, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nancy G. Ross to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997207) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Ross, Nancy)
October 15, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lyons-Berg on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee (Lyons-Berg, Andrew)
October 15, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Netter on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee (Netter, Brian)
October 15, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy G. Ross on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee (Ross, Nancy)
October 15, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Block on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee (Block, Samuel)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice per revised Affidavit #14 , Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2018. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice per revised Affidavit #18 Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2018. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice per revised Affidavit #20 , Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2018. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 Amended EXHIBIT A (Declaration of Nancy G. Ross) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nancy G. Ross to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997207). (Murphy, Susan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 Amended EXHIBIT A (Declaration of Samuel D. Block) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel D. Block to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997209). (Murphy, Susan)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 Amended EXHIBIT A (Declaration of Brian D. Netter) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian D. Netter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997208). (Murphy, Susan)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew A. Lyons-Berg, Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2018. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiff's complaint. The pre-filing conference request is due on or before 10/19/2018. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/5/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew A. Lyons-Berg to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997210) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, Susan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel D. Block to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997209) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, Susan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian D. Netter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997208) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, Susan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nancy G. Ross to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4997207) by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, Susan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until So Ordered Time to Plead #1 Complaint, #8 Summons Returned Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed by Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Murphy, Susan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan S. Murphy on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation, Retirement Investment & Administration Committee (Murphy, Susan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Reidt. Retirement Investment & Administration Committee served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Izard, Robert)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Reidt. Frontier Communications Corporation served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Izard, Robert)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Frontier Communications Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert A. Izard, Jr.* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe, LLP-CT* *29 South Main St., Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Hernandez, T.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Retirement Investment & Administration Committee* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert A. Izard, Jr.* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe, LLP-CT* *29 South Main St., Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Hernandez, T.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Mary Reidt, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 09/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/11/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/11/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2018. Discovery due by 3/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 09/11/2018.(Hernandez, T.)
September 11, 2018 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
September 11, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Retirement Investment & Administration Committee. (Izard, Robert) Modified on 9/12/2018 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
September 11, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Frontier Communications Corporation. (Izard, Robert)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4965170.), filed by Mary Reidt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Izard, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reidt v. Frontier Communications Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Retirement Investment & Administration Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Communications Corporation
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Represented By: Brian D. Netter
Represented By: Samuel Block
Represented By: Andrew Lyons-Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retirement Investment & Administration Committee
Represented By: Brian D. Netter
Represented By: Andrew Lyons-Berg
Represented By: Susan S. Murphy
Represented By: Samuel Block
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Reidt
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?