Innamorato et al v. Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Innamorato and Joann Innamorato
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Blodgett Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC and Union Carbide Corp
Case Number: 3:2018cv01556
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Plaintiffs' #25 motion to voluntarily dismiss all remaining defendants, without prejudice, is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED as to Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC. and Blodgett Corporation under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) because no responsive pleadings have been filed by these parties. It is DENIED as to Union Carbide Corporation under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) because Union Carbide Corporation has filed an answer. In order to voluntarily dismiss claims against Union Carbide Corporation, plaintiffs must file a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/15/2018. (Ram, Megha)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. Plaintiffs' #23 motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/15/2018. (Ram, Megha)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Plaintiffs' #24 motion to withdraw #23 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/15/2018. (Ram, Megha)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Plaintiffs' #13 motion to voluntarily dismiss Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, with prejudice, is hereby GRANTED under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/15/2018. (Ram, Megha)
October 12, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Innamorato.Responses due by 11/2/2018 (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
October 12, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw #23 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Innamorato. (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Innamorato.Responses due by 11/2/2018 (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
October 8, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corp. (Centeno, Christy)
October 8, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Union Carbide Corp.(Centeno, Christy)
October 8, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Christy E. Centeno on behalf of Union Carbide Corp (Centeno, Christy)
October 4, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Blodgett Corporation to 11/11/2018. (Johnson, D.)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The #17 motion for extension of time is hereby GRANTED. Defendant Blodgett Corporation will have until November 11, 2018 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/4/2018. (Self, A.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC (Statement in Compliance with Standing Order for Removed Cases) (Milrad, Joshua)
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/11/2018 to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint by Blodgett Corporation. (Ludlum, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The 15 order was entered erroneously and is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/25/2018. (Self, A.)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Defendant has filed a #13 motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim. On or before, October 16, 2018, Plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which Plaintiff pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendant's memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after October 16, 2018. If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendant renews the motion to dismiss, Defendant may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/25/2018. (Self, A.)
September 24, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC to 10/21/2018. (Johnson, D.)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The #12 motion for extension of time is hereby GRANTED. The defendant will have until October 21, 2018 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/24/2018. (Self, A.)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Joann Innamorato, Joseph Innamorato.Responses due by 10/15/2018 (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 21, 2018 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC. (Milrad, Joshua)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Blodgett Corporation, Union Carbide Corp, Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 7 Order,,,,, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Blodgett Corporation, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Blodgett Corporation, Union Carbide Corp, Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #10 Protective Order, #9 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 09/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Peterson, M)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. In removed cases predicated on diversity jurisdiction involving limited liability companies, this Court requires a signed statement setting forth "the citizenship of each... member, and if any such... member is itself a partnership, limited liability partnership or limited liability company or corporation, the citizenship of each member." (Standing Order on Removed Cases, Appendix to D. Conn. Local Rules). See Carden v. Arkoma Associates, 494 U.S. 185, 195 (1990) ('In sum, we reject the contention that to determine, for diversity purposes, the citizenship of an artificial entity, the court may consult the citizenship of less than all of the entity's members. We adhere to our oft repeated rule that diversity jurisdiction in a suit by or against the entity depends on the citizenship of all the members...." (internal quotation marks omitted)). Defendant Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC has failed to file such a statement or to include such information in its removal notice, particularly with regard to the plaintiff. Defendant Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC shall file such a statement on the docket within fourteen (14) days of this order. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/19/2018. (Self, A.)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Thompson, Melicent)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melicent B. Thompson on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Thompson, Melicent)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney, III on behalf of Blodgett Corporation (Rooney, John)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/14/2018. (Peterson, M)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/14/2018.(Peterson, M)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2018 Discovery due by 3/16/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2019 Signed by Clerk on 09/14/2018.(Peterson, M)
September 14, 2018 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC, Blodgett Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Union Carbide Corporation (Notice of Compliance with Standing Orders for Removed Cases: Notice of Pending Motions) (Milrad, Joshua)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC, Blodgett Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Union Carbide Corporation (Notice to Counsel Regarding Local Rule 5(b) (Milrad, Joshua)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC from Superior Court for the State of Connecticut for the Judicial District Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV-18-6077814-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4970032, filed by Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Milrad, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innamorato et al v. Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Melicent B. Thompson
Represented By: Jacqueline Ann Maulucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blodgett Corporation
Represented By: John F. Rooney, III
Represented By: Robert Stuart Ludlum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Laurence Milrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corp
Represented By: Christy E. Centeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Innamorato
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Innamorato
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?