Pringle v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Franklin Pringle, Jr and Franklin Pringle, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01623
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405dc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R Underhill for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 10/3/18.(Walker, J.)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. Service made by Clerk via email. (Anastasio, F.)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Daniel D. Skuret* *215 Division St., Po Box 158* *Ansonia, CT 06401*. (Anastasio, F.)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Notice re: Statistical Information Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/26/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/26/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
September 26, 2018 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Skuret, Daniel)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4985735.), filed by Franklin Pringle, Jr.(Skuret, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pringle v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Pringle, Jr
Represented By: Daniel D. Skuret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Pringle, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel D. Skuret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?