Ramos v. Malloy et al
Plaintiff: Jose E. Ramos
Defendant: State of Connecticut, George Jepsen, Scott Semple, Lawrence Tytla, William Mulligan and Dannel P. Malloy
Case Number: 3:2018cv01669
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Dannel P. Malloy, George Jepsen, Lawrence Tytla, Scott Semple, State of Connecticut, William Mulligan against Jose E. Ramos.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2018.(Gould, K.)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER For the reasons set forth in the attached document, the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/6/18.(Dooley, Kari)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 10/26/2018. (Payton, R.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose E. Ramos. (Payton, R.)
October 18, 2018 Set Deadline: Dismissal due by 11/9/2018 (Gould, K.)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Although you have sworn under penalty of perjury that the responses in the IFP application are truthful you did not answer question 6. Please file a new IFP application and a Ledger Sheet showing the past Six Months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 11/8/2018 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 10/18/2018.(Payton, R.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/9/2018. (Oliver, T.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/9/2018. (Oliver, T.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/9/2018. (Oliver, T.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose E. Ramos. (Oliver, T.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against State of Connecticut, George Jepsen, Dannel P. Malloy, William Mulligan, Scott Semple, Lawrence Tytla, filed by Jose E. Ramos. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Malloy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose E. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Jepsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Semple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Tytla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannel P. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?