O'Hara v. MortgageIT, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Edward O'Hara
Defendant: IndyMac Bancorp, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP, U.S. Bank National Association, MortgageIT, Inc, Leopold & Associates PLLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, Inc and MortgageIT, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01672
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Citibank, N.A., Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP, IndyMac Bancorp, Inc., Leopold & Associates PLLC, MortgageIT, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, Inc, U.S. Bank National Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Edward O'Hara* *P.O. Box 1123* *Greenwich, CT 06831*. (Payton, R.)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Edward O'Hara, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Edward O'Hara Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2018.(Payton, R.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/9/2018.(Payton, R.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/9/2018.(Payton, R.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2018 Discovery due by 4/10/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2019 Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2018.(Payton, R.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Consent to Electronic Notice by Edward O'Hara (Payton, R.)
October 9, 2018 Filing fee received from Edward O'Hara: $ 400.00, receipt number CTXB00009620 (Payton, R.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citibank, N.A., Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP, IndyMac Bancorp, Inc., Leopold & Associates PLLC, MortgageIT, Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing, Inc, U.S. Bank National Association, filed by Edward O'Hara.(Payton, R.)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/9/2018.(Payton, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Hara v. MortgageIT, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bancorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MortgageIT, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leopold & Associates PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MortgageIT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?