White v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Crystal White
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01676
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: William I Garfinkel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 12 RECOMMENDED RULING : For the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the Undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). This is a Recommended Ruling. Any objection must be filed within 14 days after service. Objections due by 12/19/2018. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 12/5/18.(Cates, S)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis based upon the financial affidavit provided, but for the reasons set forth in the Recommended Ruling filed herewith, the Undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(b). Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 12/5/18. (Cates, S)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Judge William I. Garfinkel for request to proceed in forma pauperis. Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Washington, Gregory)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2018. Discovery due by 4/10/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-08847.
October 2, 2018 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Crystal White 229 Lansdowne Westport, CT 06880. (vba)
October 1, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Connecticut (tro)
October 1, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/1/2018) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
September 25, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Document filed by Crystal White. (sac)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Crystal White.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?