Roe v. Hotchkiss School
Plaintiff: Richard Roe
Defendant: The Hotchkiss School and Hotchkiss School
Case Number: 3:2018cv01701
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Annika K. Martin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5010825). (Reis, Julia)
December 5, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct To be Admitted Pro Hac Vice # 15 by Richard Roe.Responses due by 12/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Wendy R. Fleishman)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct To be Admitted Pro Hac Vice # 13 by Richard Roe.Responses due by 12/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Fabrice N. Vincent)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Annika K. Martin on behalf of Richard Roe (Martin, Annika)
November 27, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hotchkiss School. (Dion, Kathleen)
November 27, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. White on behalf of Hotchkiss School (White, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford S. Babbitt on behalf of Hotchkiss School (Babbitt, Bradford)
November 27, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Elizabeth Dion on behalf of Hotchkiss School (Dion, Kathleen)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #18 Motion for Attorney Wendy R. Fleishman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should refer to Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b), which requires the affidavit to "identify[] the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating..." (emphasis added). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/1/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #13 Motion for Attorney Fabrice N. Vincent to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should refer to Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(e), which requires that the affidavit designate the sponsoring attorney as agent for service of process. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/1/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
October 25, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Wendy R. Fleishman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5022999) by Richard Roe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Wendy R. Fleishman)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richard Roe waiver sent on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018 filed by Hotchkiss School. (Martin, Annika)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/16/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/18. (Velez, F.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Annika K. Martin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5010825) by Richard Roe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Annika K. Martin, Esq.)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 Amended AFFIDAVIT re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Fabrice N. Vincent to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5010683) Signed By Fabrice N. Vincent filed by Richard Roe. (Cuthbertson, Hugh)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Fabrice N. Vincent to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5010683) by Richard Roe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Fabrice N. Vincent)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge by Richard Roe. (Cuthbertson, Hugh)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh W. Cuthbertson on behalf of Richard Roe (Cuthbertson, Hugh)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn A. Duhl on behalf of Richard Roe (Duhl, Glenn)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hotchkiss School* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Annika K. Martin* *Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Berstein, LLP - NY* *250 Hudson St., 8th Floor* *New York, NY 10013*. (Velez, F.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Complaint filed by Richard Roe, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Related Case filed by Richard Roe, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2018. (Velez, F.)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/12/2018. (Velez, F.)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/12/2018. (Velez, F.)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/12/2018. (Velez, F.) Modified on 10/16/2018 to correct file date. (Velez, F.)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2018; Discovery due by 4/16/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2018. (Velez, F.) Modified on 10/16/2018 to correct file date. (Velez, F.)
October 12, 2018 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
October 12, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to The Hotchkiss School. (Martin, Annika)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Richard Roe (Martin, Annika)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Hotchkiss School ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5007205.), filed by Richard Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Martin, Annika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Hotchkiss School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hotchkiss School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotchkiss School
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Dion
Represented By: Bradford S. Babbitt
Represented By: Jeffrey J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Roe
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: Hugh W. Cuthbertson
Represented By: Glenn A. Duhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?