USA v. 2017 Maserati Levante bearing VIN: ZN661XUL4HX245650

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 2017 Maserati Levante bearing VIN: ZN661XUL4HX245650
Claimant: Connex Credit Union, Inc. and Orlando Quiros
Case Number: 3:2018cv01768
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT Signed By Representative of Claimant Connex Credit Union, Inc. filed by Connex Credit Union, Inc.. (Lubus, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Lubus, Jr on behalf of Connex Credit Union, Inc. (Lubus, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 WARRANT of Arrest in rem issued. (Fanelle, N.)
October 30, 2018 Duplicate entry; please disregard re #8 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #6 Protective Order, #7 Electronic Filing Order. (Velez, F.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order Re: Chambers Practices, and #1 Complaint filed by USA. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2018. (Shafer, J.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DUPLICATE ENTRY -- ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/26/2018. (Velez, F.) Modified on 10/30/2018 (Velez, F.).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DUPLICATE ENTRY -- ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/26/2018. (Velez, F.) Modified on 10/30/2018 (Velez, F.).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DUPLICATE ENTRY -- STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/26/2018. (Velez, F.) Modified on 10/30/2018 (Velez, F.).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/26/2018. (Shafer, J.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/26/2018. (Shafer, J.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/26/2018.(Shafer, J.)
October 26, 2018 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2017 Maserati Levante bearing VIN: ZN661XUL4HX245650, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Stipulated Settlement Agreement)(Sullivan, David) Modified on 10/26/2018 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 2017 Maserati Levante bearing VIN: ZN661XUL4HX245650
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Connex Credit Union, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Lubus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Orlando Quiros
Represented By: Brian J. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David X. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2017 Maserati Levante bearing VIN: ZN661XUL4HX245650
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?