Shaylor v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Michelle L. Shaylor
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01773
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Aetna Life Insurance Company and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. to 1/28/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time until January 28, 2019 (Unopposed) To Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/12/2018. (Gutierrez, Y.)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2019 (Unopposed) To Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tomasco, Jean)
November 28, 2018 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/14/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Elizabeth Tomasco on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Tomasco, Jean)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Tucci on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Tucci, Theodore)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Michelle L. Shaylor Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2018.(Reis, Julia)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/26/2018.(Reis, Julia)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/26/2018.(Reis, Julia)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/25/2018 Discovery due by 4/27/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2019 Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2018.(Reis, Julia)
October 26, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5025207.), filed by Michelle L. Shaylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaylor v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore J. Tucci
Represented By: Jean Elizabeth Tomasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Tucci
Represented By: Jean Elizabeth Tomasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L. Shaylor
Represented By: Ivan A. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?